Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2582 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15988 Week
» 69004 Month
» 188531 Year
» 3215384 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
5595 |
on |
05/01/1935 |
British Railways |
45595 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/05/1954 |
Bangor MPD |
Much to the shed-master's chagrin, no L.N.W.R. 'old stagers' remain. The 'coal tank' has gone to Monument Lane, the 'Cauliflower' to Stoke-on-Trent, and the 2-4-2 tank to Crewe. The Amlwch branch is entirely worked by Ivatt 2-6-2 tanks, of which Bangor has Nos. 41200, 41212, 41223, an 41233. Periodic loads of iron pyrites are worked over the branch to the Associated Ethyl Corporation Works at Amlwch Port. The load for the 2-6-2 tanks was scheduled for 20 loaded wagons, but has had to be reduced to 16. A number of Fairburn and Stanier 2-6-4 tanks, which have been at Bangor for some time, have recently departed to Greenock, and from the latter shed two of the parallel boiler Fowler type have been received in exchange, Nos. 42415/6. The present L.Y.R. contingent, employed on shunting at Menai Bridge Sidings, local trips and on the Bangor Harbour branch, comprised Nos. 52219, 52269/70. The only L.N.W.R. locomotive seen at Bangor was No. 49416 of 8D, which had arrived the previous day with a load of sleepers. The other 'visitors' were No. 45595 of 9A and one of the inevitable 'Austerity' 2-8-0's from Mold Junction. |
SLS/195407 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/01/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 5595, name: SOUTHERN RHODESIA Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24153 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45595 |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
30/01/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45595 |
|
|
30/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
05/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|