31/12/1948 |
Crewe Works |
New Work December: 'IVĀ° more '2F' 2-6-0's were completed dunng December-Nos. 46433 and 46434 on 8/12 and 13/12 respectively, thus completing the present order. Tne last Caprotti 4-6-0 of Order E 468, No. 44757, was completed on 22/12. No. 44728 (No. 11 of Order E 472) was completed on 31/12; the first ten of this order are to be built at Horwich. Another 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0, No. 45534, has been rebuilt with a taper boiler-completed on 10/12. No. 45522 will shortly be similarly dealt with. Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 1201, 2254, 2438/51/61/77/82, 2654/60/86/99, 2610/14/18/28/44/48/78/82, 4739/48/49, 4849/84, 4908/17/18/31/50/81, 5000/24/41/55/59/68/93, 5108/40/47, 5274/93, 4387, 5404/44/94, 5508/33/46, 5617/30/33/36/54/55/66/78, 5705, 6115/19/37/47/50/52/56, 6207/31/49/53, 6654, 6656(27A), 6727, 7757, 7803, 7987/99, 8001/63/93/98, 8143/89/97, 8200/71/80, 8373, 8409/17/39/62, 8509/20, 8606/34/51/53/59/96, 8700/03/18, 9072/85, 9122/26/64/84, 924/57/67/93, 9321/33/49, 9416/19/47, 28093, 42386, 42565, 44766, 44830, 45005/80, 46107/12/17/20/21, 47977, 49059, 49298, 58924. During w/e 8/12, No. 46121 was renamed The Highland Light Infantry (Glasgow Regiment) and fitted with a plaque. |
SLS/194902 |
27/08/1949 |
St. Rollox Works |
Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 579/97, 600, 40901/05, 41142, 42745, 2806/81, 43849, 4009, 4255. 4879, 5012, 45081, 45115/20/53/57/62/63/71/73/78/79, 45359, 45455/58/60/68/86/87, 45560/79/83, 45645, 45729/31, 46107, 54446/58/92/96, 15167, 55187, 15194, 55197, 15200, 16360/66, 17356, 17407, 57465, 17585, 17621. |
SLS/194910 |
08/10/1961 |
Crewe Works (Works Sidings) |
Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. |
SLS/196111 |
15/10/1961 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. |
SLS/196111 |
31/05/1962 |
Royal Scot denaming |
The third 'Royal Scot' Class 7P 4-6-0 loco to be de-named is 46106 (formerly Gordon Highlander) which had both nameplates removed in May. In view of the names allocated to further Sc. Reg. 'Deltics', it seems highly probable that those at present carried by 46102 Black Watch, 46104 Scottish Borderer, 46105 Cameron Highlander and 46107 Argyll and Sutherland Highlander will be similarly removed in due course. |
SLS/196210 |
14/04/1963 |
Polmadie MPD (in store) |
in steam-45663, 46166, 46222/42/9 with 46230 under repair, and in store-46105/7/21, 46227, 72000-4 an 45098. |
SLS/196304 |