|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/04/1955 | Royal Scot failure | On 17th April, No. 46108 'Seaforth Highlander' of Holbeck, carrying the 'Thames-Clyde Express' headboard, and running light and tender first towards Carlisle, was noted staggering through Langwathby station, working on one side only. She stopped opposite Langwathby Box while the fireman moved the tail lamp from the left hand to the right hand of the buffer beam. She had presumably failed on the up Sunday express somewhere in the direction of Hawes. | SLS/195505 |
15/10/1961 | Crewe Works (Paint Shop) | Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. | SLS/196111 |
17/03/1963 | Carlisle Upperby MPD (Stored) | In steam at Upperby on 17th March were 46221/35/7/8/45. Stored on same day at Upperby-46106/8/23/7/34/250; | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Cardiff (Stored) | The E.E. Type 3s now being delivered are being sent after acceptance trials at Doncaster and not in order; D6821 was delivered l.e, via GC line 19th April, D6822 via London 24th April, staying overnight at Willesden (and sent to Cardiff 25/4); D6834/5 were delivered l.e. via GC line 24th April, and D6836 on 30th April (D7076/8 were attached to latter as far as swindon). The two E.E.s D6742/3 which have been on crew training since October, 1962, were returned to the E.R. on 22nd April. | SLS/196304 |
16/04/1963 | Crewe Works (Yard) | Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1064-73 (in various stages of construction), D1550 body built (Brush 2750 H.P. D.E.)- New Construction. D210/17, D305/10/16/30/36/43/73, D8003/14/18, 44675/89, 44756, 44810/28, 45410, 45531, 46515/22, 48404/44, 48526, 48680, 70016/23/46, 82042, 92035, 92127/46/52/53 92207/39. Outside Erecting Shop: 45322, 70035, 80136, For Butlin's Camp, Pwllheli 46100, For Butlin's Camp, Skegness 46203. Yard: 42182, 42426/69, 42592, 44877, 45067, 45126, 45481, 46106/08/23/27, 47380, 82036, 92104/201. Paint Shop and Outside: D1062/3, D57, D214, 44710, 44869, 45002/26/33/42, 45481, 46486, 48660, 92044/97/155 78002. Scrap Road: 46124/34/35. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/09/1927 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6108, name: SEAFORTH HIGHLANDER Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) | ||
05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 46108 | ||
06/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
28/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Preston (24K) | ||
23/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
10/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
05/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
26/01/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 46108 | ||
02/05/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |