|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1953 | Edinburgh, Murrayfield | Once again the International Rugby Match between Scotland and Wales provided Edinburgh with its biggest influx of special trains for any one event, 31 arriving between Thursday and Saturday morning from Wales, 24 at Princes Street, 7 at Waverley. On Thursday, 5 arrived at Princes Street during the day and among the locos were Nos. 45725 (19B) and 45552 (5A). The coaches included a set of Southern malachite green boat train coaches, a number of which were second class. All Thursday's locos were sent to Carstairs. Friday produced another 6 at Princes Street headed by such Jubilee's as 45686 (5A); 45627 (14B), 45703 (3B); 45735 (1B); and 45742 (9A). On Saturday 7 arrived at Waverley, 3 of which were hauled by 64B locos the rest by Stanier 5, 44711 (2A); 44759 (5A); 44774 (20A) and 44775 (20A). The 13 arrivals due at Princes Street started at 4.23 a.m. continuing till 10.16 a.m. Among the foreigners were 46166 (5A); 45654 (19B); 46138 (1B); 45670 (8A). The average number of cars per train was eleven and most trains had restaurant cars, all of which were Western Region with W.R. men who were provided with sleeping accommodation in five sleeping cars in Lothian Road Goods Yard. The return working of these trains started at 10.0 p.m. on Saturday and they continued to leave at roughly 10 minute intervals till 1.0 p.m. on Sunday, with breaks only between 2.10 a.m. till 9.5 am. and 10.10 a.m. and 11.25 a.m. The 7 from Waverley left between 11 p.m. and 2 a.m. Saturday night. Great credit is due to all concerned that only one train was over an hour in arriving; this was due to the one and only engine failure. Even greater credit is due to the organisation which successfully got every train out of Princes Street on time, on Sunday, and there is no doubt that a great victory over the buses was achieved. | SLS/195304 |
08/10/1961 | Crewe Works (Works Sidings) | Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. | SLS/196111 |
04/02/1962 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through £50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/10/1927 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6138, name: THE LONDON IRISH RIFLEMAN Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A) | ||
01/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 46138 | ||
15/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holyhead (7C) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holyhead (7C) | ||
19/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
16/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
11/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
03/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
04/12/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
01/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
11/08/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) | ||
03/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
07/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) | ||
18/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) | ||
17/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) | ||
11/04/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) | ||
10/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 46138 | ||
09/05/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |