Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2550 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15956 Week
» 68972 Month
» 188499 Year
» 3215352 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6153 |
m/e |
07/1930 |
British Railways |
46153 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
7P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 07/1930 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/12/1962 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 5 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/08/1949 |
Crewe Works |
21/8: New construction here was as follows: North Shed Nos. 41230/31/33; all have the crest (a smaller version than hitherto) on the tank sides. Nos. 41230/31 were due to go 'light' on 22/8 to Bangor and Denbigh respectively (No. 41231 had been working in and around the Birmingham area the previous week); Paint Shop Nos. 41234/35 and 41236 outside; Erecting Shop Nos. 41237 (complete), 41238 (almost complete with tanks), 41239 (frames and cylinders set up, boiler in separate bay, not yet mounted); Yard No. 41240 (frames and cylinders only). No. 48288 (ex W.D. 70403) was being repaired while W.D. Nos. 70438, 70584/99 were in the Works' yard. Locomotives in the new green livery included Nos. 45566/78/89, 45615, 46153/61. Scrap Road: On the cutting up road were Nos. 8948 an 9597, while No. 6004 was actually being cut up. Nos. 25297 an 25752 were over in the Carriage Shed marked 'Not to be cut up' |
SLS/194909 |
28/11/1959 |
Bushbury MPD |
To work the remaining Wolverhampton-B'ham-London trains (via Northampton) Royal Scots 46122/41/3/53/8 and Patriot 45540 have been allocated in place of the Jubilees (transferred to Carlisle). |
SLS/196001 |
07/01/1961 |
Trafford Park MPD |
70004/14/5/7/21/32/3/42 have been transferred to Willesden and replaced by 45540, 46106/22/37/41/3/53/8. On Saturday, 7th January, 70004 worked the 12-34 p.m. Watford-New St. Birmingham and returned on the 7-37 p.m. New St.-Euston. |
SLS/196102 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6153 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Camden (1B) |
|
|
22/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46153 |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (16D) |
|
|
22/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46153 |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|