|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/11/1950 | Midland Region Mishap | On 16th November, rebuilt 'Royal Scot' (of Bourne End notoriety) failed at Berkhamsted with the 8.30 p.m. 'Postal.' A bent connecting-rod made the engine immovable. After 2 hours' delay No. 45091 drew the train back either to Boxmoor or Watford, there being no cross-over between fast and slow roads at Berkhamsted; and the train eventually went through on the slow road behind No. 44904, at 11.34 p.m., 2½ hours late. At 1.0 a.m. a fitters' tool-van arrived, and after much hammering in the dead of night succeeded in making No. 46157 movable; and she was towed away at 2 a.m., after blocking the down fast line for five hours, during which time all down traffic had to use the slow road from Bourne End. | SLS/195101 |
28/11/1959 | Nottingham MPD | Three Royal Scots have been allocated viz. 46100/40/57. | SLS/196001 |
07/05/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D100-2, 41254/65/73, 41325, 44872, 90173 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D103/5, 44837/43, 45565, 49395, 90582. Works Sidings: 41222, 42114, 42283, 42569, 43200, 43605, 44731/64, 44906, 45150, 45226/53, 45417, 45507/84, 46130, 46227/45, 46410/43, 47513, 47625, 48262, 48435, 48603, 48895, 49431, 70050, 78021, 90033, 92107. Erecting Shop: D110-6, 41246/64, 42110/54/60/86, 42285, 42557, 42618, 44750/62, 44834/9/91, 44932, 45078, 45142/82, 45238/74, 45300/97, 45441, 45514/21/45, 45613/28/44/64/95, 45701/2/10/36, 46127/50/7/70, 46246/7, 46487, 46501, 48171, 48317/54, 48430/74, 48511, 48672, 49094, 78031/62, 90214/99, 90315, 90530, 90712, 92020/49. Outside Erecting Shop: 42584, 44937, 45014, 45681, 48418/31/44, 90555, 92124. New Erecting Shop: D106-9/17-9. Scrap Road: 40204, 40589, 43515, 43729, 43948, 44072, 44357, 44480, 47626/37, 58221, with 47190 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 43957, 44363, 44552, 47592, 51412, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. | SLS/196106 |
03/06/1961 | Leeds-Birmingham-Bristol line | With the advent of the Summer t.t. several steam workings have gone over to Type 4 Sulzers; whilst only 3 A3 Pacifics are left at Holbeck, Saltley has gained 3 class 6P and 11 Class 7P 4-6-0s viz., 45579, 45648/9, 45532/40, 46100/3/12/8/22/41/57/60/2. It is presumed that these latter will be utilised on Saturdays for the many extra trains which are run (and upon which 2-10-0s were utilised last year). | SLS/196107 |
03/06/1962 | Saltley MPD | The following Royal Scots have been placed in store-46103/22/32/60 all ex Works; 46157/62; 46123 was under repair on 3rd June but was also scheduled for storage. | SLS/196207 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/07/1930 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6157, name: THE ROYAL ARTILLERYMAN Built at Derby Works |
||
22/06/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Holyhead (7C) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holyhead (7C) | ||
02/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
12/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 46157 | ||
16/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holyhead (7C) | ||
14/08/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
09/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
30/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Camden (1B) | ||
04/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
17/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (21A) | ||
30/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
22/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) | ||
04/01/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 46157 | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |