Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 3374 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16780 Week
» 69796 Month
» 189323 Year
» 3216176 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Caledonian Railway |
944 |
m/e |
03/1917 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
15350 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
55350 |
|
01/01/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1917 |
12F |
|
Beattock |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
31/03/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
12F |
Beattock |
w/e |
03/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
12F |
Beattock |
w/e |
14/06/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
31/03/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1950 |
Kilmarnock Works |
Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 40151/87, 40610, 40902, 42165, 42211, 42915, 15350, 17280, 57457, 57594, 17655. |
SLS/195005 |
31/07/1950 |
St. Rollox Works |
Engines due into Works, July 1950: 40624, 42273, 42879, 44255, 44318, 44796, 45053/87, 45171, 45365, 45560/77, 45730, 15235/60, 55350, 16274, 16331, 17424, 57588, 57608, 17633. |
SLS/195010 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1917 |
To Service |
To service as Caledonian Railway Number 944 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21480 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 15350 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Beattock (12F) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55350 |
|
|
31/03/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55350 |
|
|