Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1860 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15266 Week
» 68282 Month
» 187809 Year
» 3214662 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Caledonian Railway |
947 |
m/e |
01/1917 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
15353 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
55353 |
|
01/01/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1917 |
12F |
|
Beattock |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
30/06/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
12F |
Beattock |
w/e |
02/11/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
30/06/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1950 |
Kilmarnock Works |
Engines due into Works, July 1950: 40159, 40688/9, 41092, 41109/28/55, 44330, 45174, 55269, 55353/9, 57613. |
SLS/195010 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1917 |
To Service |
To service as Caledonian Railway Number 947 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21483 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 15353 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Beattock (12F) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55353 |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55353 |
|
|