Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 955 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14361 Week
» 67377 Month
» 186904 Year
» 3213757 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4534 |
m/e |
04/1913 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
45xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
191 |
Works Number |
2500 |
To Service |
During 04/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 17/02/1955 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,041,520 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1913 |
HFD |
|
Hereford |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
83D |
|
Laira |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/02/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GLO |
Gloucester Horton Road |
4w/e |
06/09/1947 |
ALLOC |
83D |
Laira |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
28/02/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4534 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2500 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hereford (HFD) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
17/02/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4534 |
|
|
21/05/1955 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|