Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 2352 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15758 Week
» 68774 Month
» 188301 Year
» 3215154 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5716 |
m/e |
03/1929 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1929 |
FGD |
|
Fishguard Goodwick |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
12/03/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/03/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5716 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23834 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fishguard Goodwick (FGD) |
|
|
12/03/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5716 |
|
|
09/08/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|