Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1104 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18907 Week
» 71923 Month
» 191450 Year
» 3218303 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5731 |
m/e |
02/1929 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5731 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23849 |
|
|
20/04/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (LLY) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Duffryn Yard (DYD) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
28/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H) |
|
|
30/05/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5731 |
|
|
10/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|