Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 29 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17832 Week
» 70848 Month
» 190375 Year
» 3217228 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5740 |
m/e |
03/1929 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1929 |
PILL |
|
Newport Pill |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/06/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
PILL |
Newport Pill |
4w/e |
25/01/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/06/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5740 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23858 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newport Pill (PILL) |
|
|
22/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5740 |
|
|
08/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|