Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 160 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17963 Week
» 70979 Month
» 190506 Year
» 3217359 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5742 |
m/e |
03/1929 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1929 |
TYS |
|
Tyseley |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
84J |
|
Croes Newydd |
4w/e |
25/03/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/09/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
4w/e |
25/03/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/09/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5742 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23860 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
25/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) |
|
|
15/09/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5742 |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|