|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1948 | 08/12/1948 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1950 | 12/05/1950 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1950 | 13/07/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1950 | 28/09/1950 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1951 | 22/01/1952 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1952 | 18/02/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/02/1953 | 10/02/1953 | 7 days | Unclassified | ATC fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1953 | 31/07/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 29813 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1953 | 20/09/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | For Doncaster Works Centenary Exhibition |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1955 | 14/05/1955 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29878 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/09/1955 | 12/09/1955 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1957 | 12/04/1957 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1957 | 30/10/1957 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1959 | 17/02/1959 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29865 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1959 | 11/06/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1959 | 21/10/1959 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1959 | 19/12/1959 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1960 | 21/04/1960 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1961 | 29/03/1961 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29880 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/05/1962 | 12/07/1962 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1963 | 05/04/1963 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1964 | 19/09/1964 | 45 days | Light Casual | Fractured cylinder |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1950 | A.1 namings | Latest reported nameplates affixed to 'A.1' Class: 60117 Bois Rousell; 60118 Archibald Sturrock; 60119 Patrick Stirling; 60122 Curlew; 60123 H. A. Ivatt; 60126 Sir Vincent Raven; 60130 Kestrel; 60140 Balmoral. | SLS/195010 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (On shed, waiting Works) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
10/03/1963 | Doncaster Works (Waiting Works) | Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. | SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 | Worcester Works (Waiting Works) | 4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. | SLS/196304 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington Works (Yard Paint shop) | New Engine Shop: D3940, 12116, tender of 60530. Main Erecting shop: 60530 Sayajirao, 60844, 61214, 61330, 62059, 73095, 73132, 76095/9, 93368/610, D2246/72, D3657. Yard Paint shop: 60118 Archibald Sturrock. Yard: 43008 an 62041 being painted, 60522 Straight Deal, 60145 Saint Mungo, 60011 frames only, 61038 without nameplates, 61084, 63393, 65033/99, 43123, 44734, 68062, D2700, 90407; North Rd. scrap yard: 61229, 61321 and tender of 60020. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/11/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60118 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2035 Allocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
06/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/12/1948. Dep: 08/12/1948. | ||
03/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1950. Dep: 12/05/1950. | ||
12/05/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
07/1950 | Naming | Named 'ARCHIBALD STURROCK' | ||
10/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/07/1950. Dep: 13/07/1950. | ||
24/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/09/1950. Dep: 28/09/1950. | ||
17/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/12/1951. Dep: 22/01/1952. | ||
18/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 18/02/1952. Dep: 18/02/1952. | ||
04/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/02/1953. Dep: 10/02/1953. Work undertaken: ATC fitted |
||
06/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1953. Dep: 31/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29813 (Diagram 118) |
||
16/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1953. Dep: 20/09/1953. Work undertaken: For Doncaster Works Centenary Exhibition |
||
06/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29878 (Diagram 118) |
||
12/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 12/09/1955. Dep: 12/09/1955. | ||
13/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1957. Dep: 12/04/1957. | ||
14/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/10/1957. Dep: 30/10/1957. | ||
05/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1959. Dep: 17/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29865 (Diagram 118) |
||
06/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/06/1959. Dep: 11/06/1959. | ||
15/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/10/1959. Dep: 21/10/1959. | ||
05/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/12/1959. Dep: 19/12/1959. | ||
17/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1960. Dep: 21/04/1960. | ||
16/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1961. Dep: 29/03/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29880 (Diagram 118) |
||
29/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/05/1962. Dep: 12/07/1962. | ||
04/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
11/03/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/03/1963. Dep: 05/04/1963. | ||
28/07/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
06/08/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/08/1964. Dep: 19/09/1964. Work undertaken: Fractured cylinder |
||
04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60118 from Neville Hill (55H) |