|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1949 | 08/07/1949 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1950 | 19/05/1950 | 39 days | General | Named SILURIAN |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1950 | 26/05/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1951 | 11/07/1951 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1951 | 20/12/1951 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29816 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1952 | 18/11/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1953 | 29/04/1953 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29815 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1954 | 14/12/1954 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29800 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1954 | 24/12/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1957 | 03/04/1957 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29839 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1957 | 30/05/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1958 | 22/10/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/12/1958 | 16/12/1958 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1959 | 22/01/1960 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29864 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1960 | 12/07/1960 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1961 | 20/04/1961 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1962 | 02/11/1962 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1963 | 15/05/1963 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 29863 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1963 | 27/05/1963 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1963 | 14/06/1963 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1963 | 25/07/1963 | 25 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1950 | Recently named engines | Engines recently named include 60121 Silurian, 60131 Osprey, 60137 Redgauntlet, 60139 Sea Eagle. | SLS/195008 |
10/03/1963 | Goole MPD (Crimpsall) | Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. | SLS/196304 |
23/04/1963 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall) | New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/12/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60121 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2038 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
21/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/06/1949. Dep: 08/07/1949. | ||
11/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1950. Dep: 19/05/1950. Work undertaken: Named SILURIAN |
||
19/05/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
23/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/05/1950. Dep: 26/05/1950. | ||
04/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1951. Dep: 11/07/1951. | ||
19/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1951. Dep: 20/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29816 (Diagram 118) |
||
18/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 18/11/1952. Dep: 18/11/1952. | ||
25/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1953. Dep: 29/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29815 (Diagram 118) |
||
10/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1954. Dep: 14/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29800 (Diagram 118) |
||
21/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/12/1954. Dep: 24/12/1954. | ||
21/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1957. Dep: 03/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29839 (Diagram 118) |
||
28/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/05/1957. Dep: 30/05/1957. | ||
14/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/10/1958. Dep: 22/10/1958. | ||
16/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 16/12/1958. Dep: 16/12/1958. | ||
12/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1959. Dep: 22/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29864 (Diagram 118) |
||
08/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/07/1960. Dep: 12/07/1960. | ||
08/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/04/1961. Dep: 20/04/1961. | ||
22/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/10/1962. Dep: 02/11/1962. | ||
20/03/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1963. Dep: 15/05/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29863 (Diagram 118) |
||
22/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/05/1963. Dep: 27/05/1963. | ||
06/06/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/06/1963. Dep: 14/06/1963. | ||
01/07/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/07/1963. Dep: 25/07/1963. | ||
04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60121 from York (North) (50A) |