|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1949 | 16/02/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1949 | 23/02/1949 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1949 | 09/12/1949 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1949 | 13/01/1950 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1950 | 13/07/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1950 | 20/10/1950 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1951 | 11/05/1951 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1952 | 01/04/1952 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1952 | 17/12/1952 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29852 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1953 | 22/02/1953 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1954 | 25/09/1954 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 29808 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1954 | 09/11/1954 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1956 | 11/04/1956 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1956 | 17/04/1956 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1957 | 22/01/1958 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 10599 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1958 | 24/03/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1958 | 26/09/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/04/1959 | 09/05/1959 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1960 | 01/03/1960 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 10635 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1962 | 25/05/1962 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 10636 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1962 | 24/09/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1950 | A.1 namings | Latest reported nameplates affixed to 'A.1' Class: 60117 Bois Rousell; 60118 Archibald Sturrock; 60119 Patrick Stirling; 60122 Curlew; 60123 H. A. Ivatt; 60126 Sir Vincent Raven; 60130 Kestrel; 60140 Balmoral. | SLS/195010 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/02/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60123 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2040 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
14/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/02/1949. Dep: 16/02/1949. | ||
18/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1949. Dep: 23/02/1949. | ||
07/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/11/1949. Dep: 09/12/1949. | ||
30/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/12/1949. Dep: 13/01/1950. | ||
19/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
25/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
07/1950 | Naming | Named 'H.A. IVATT' | ||
10/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/07/1950. Dep: 13/07/1950. | ||
16/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1950. Dep: 20/10/1950. | ||
16/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/04/1951. Dep: 11/05/1951. | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
24/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/03/1952. Dep: 01/04/1952. | ||
14/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1952. Dep: 17/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29852 (Diagram 118) |
||
17/12/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
17/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/02/1953. Dep: 22/02/1953. | ||
06/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1954. Dep: 25/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29808 (Diagram 118) |
||
09/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 09/11/1954. Dep: 09/11/1954. | ||
27/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1956. Dep: 11/04/1956. | ||
17/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 17/04/1956. Dep: 17/04/1956. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
19/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1957. Dep: 22/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10599 (Diagram 118) |
||
20/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/03/1958. Dep: 24/03/1958. | ||
20/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/09/1958. Dep: 26/09/1958. | ||
24/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/04/1959. Dep: 09/05/1959. | ||
25/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1960. Dep: 01/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10635 (Diagram 118) |
||
01/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
12/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1962. Dep: 25/05/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10636 (Diagram 118) |
||
24/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 24/09/1962. Dep: 24/09/1962. | ||
01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60123 from Ardsley (56B) |