|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1949 | 03/11/1949 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1950 | 05/04/1950 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1950 | 11/09/1950 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1950 | 22/12/1950 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | Named MARMION |
||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1951 | 31/01/1951 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/10/1951 | 19/10/1951 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/02/1952 | 06/03/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29865 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1953 | 15/07/1953 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29814 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1954 | 21/07/1954 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1955 | 19/04/1955 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29812 (Diagram 118) |
||
Gateshead Works | 17/05/1955 | 23/05/1955 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1956 | 26/10/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29815 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1958 | 22/04/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29834 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1959 | 12/11/1959 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 10593 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1960 | 24/08/1960 | 3 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1961 | 28/09/1961 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 29811 (Diagram 118) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1963 | 19/12/1963 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1964 | 30/01/1964 | 18 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/11/1948 | Darlington Works | The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's. It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable. |
SLS/194812 |
31/12/1950 | Newly-named \"Al\"\'s | Newly named 'A1''s are Nos. 60132 Marmion and 60146 Peregrine. | SLS/195102 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster MPD (36A) | Ex-Works on Doncaster (36A) Shed : D2398, D3446, 60059, 60132, 61098, 61196, 63922. | SLS/196111 |
18/01/1964 | Darlington Works (Yard Sidings) | Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/10/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60132 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2051 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
22/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1949. Dep: 03/11/1949. | ||
05/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/04/1950. Dep: 05/04/1950. | ||
11/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 11/09/1950. Dep: 11/09/1950. | ||
23/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/11/1950. Dep: 22/12/1950. Work undertaken: Named MARMION |
||
31/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 31/01/1951. Dep: 31/01/1951. | ||
15/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/10/1951. Dep: 19/10/1951. | ||
04/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1952. Dep: 06/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29865 (Diagram 118) |
||
06/03/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
11/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1953. Dep: 15/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29814 (Diagram 118) |
||
29/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/06/1954. Dep: 21/07/1954. | ||
09/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1955. Dep: 19/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29812 (Diagram 118) |
||
17/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/05/1955. Dep: 23/05/1955. | ||
24/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1956. Dep: 26/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29815 (Diagram 118) |
||
17/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1958. Dep: 22/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29834 (Diagram 118) |
||
06/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1959. Dep: 12/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10593 (Diagram 118) |
||
15/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
22/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/08/1960. Dep: 24/08/1960. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
11/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1961. Dep: 28/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29811 (Diagram 118) |
||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
28/11/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/11/1963. Dep: 19/12/1963. | ||
13/01/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/01/1964. Dep: 30/01/1964. | ||
06/12/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
14/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60132 from Gateshead (52A) |