|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 07/02/1949 | 08/02/1949 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1949 | 09/06/1949 | 69 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1950 | 05/07/1950 | 45 days | General | Named BALMORAL |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1951 | 23/11/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29819 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1952 | 18/12/1952 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1953 | 11/12/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29822 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/05/1954 | 24/05/1954 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1954 | 19/11/1954 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1955 | 25/11/1955 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29813 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1957 | 03/01/1958 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29802 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1958 | 28/05/1958 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/06/1958 | 19/07/1958 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1959 | 19/01/1960 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29808 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1960 | 23/07/1960 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1961 | 11/03/1961 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1962 | 01/07/1962 | 55 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1950 | A.1 namings | Latest reported nameplates affixed to 'A.1' Class: 60117 Bois Rousell; 60118 Archibald Sturrock; 60119 Patrick Stirling; 60122 Curlew; 60123 H. A. Ivatt; 60126 Sir Vincent Raven; 60130 Kestrel; 60140 Balmoral. | SLS/195010 |
18/04/1953 | Scottish Miscellany | The 7.0 p.m. Edinburgh (Waverley) to Glasgow (Queen Street) Sundays only train has this year produced a number of York 50A locos. These include 60140 (three times), 60501 an 60515 (twice), 60502 an 60512. Also seen on this train 60095 (68E), 60965 (64A), 60823 (64A). This train is worked off St. Margarets depot, the engine returning on the Monday morning. No. 67500 a 4-4-2T has occasionally appeared on the Hyndland and Milngavie trains during recent weeks. New loco. No. 76000 was noted on (23/4) on local goods to Buchanan Street. B.R. 2-6-4T are now fairly regularly used on 5.51 p.m. Carlisle to Glasgow (St. Enoch). Water is taken at Dumfries and often at Kilmarnock. With 80008 some excellent work was experienced. A late start of 11 mins. at Carlisle was reduced to a late arrival at Dumfries of 5 mins. A late start from Dumfries of 8 minutes was converted to a 2 min. early arrival at Kilmarnock. Up the Nith Valley 50 m.p.h. was regularly got with eight coaches. From Kilmarnock to a stop at Gorbals Jct. the time was 30 mins. 46 secs. including a 15 m.p.h. crawl from Strathbungo. Between Shilford and Neilson 77 m.p.h. was reached. The crew appeared to have no trouble with the train at any time, in fact one would suggest their only trouble was to hold the engine in check, so freely did it run. 40185 (2-6-2T) has been working the Kirkcudbright branch recently. On occasion of Cup Final in Glasgow on (23/4) the bulk of the trains from Aberdeen were worked by L.M. Class 5, 4-6-0, assisted by 61400 of Kittybrewster depot and 60531 Bahram. |
SLS/195306 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
08/1961 | Wakefield MPD(56A) | 60140 (56C) was under repair on 26th August; of Wakefield's five passenger turns, four are allocated to Bls and one only to a 2-6-4T with the result that the 2-6-2Ts are out of use but only 40074/147/90 appear to be stored. Two jobs are still worked by 'Jinties', shed pilot and Batley no. 1 (Batley no. 2 is a J50). Wakefield's last two LYR locomotives are 52413/61 in store in the yard. | SLS/196110 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/12/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60140 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2059 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
07/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/02/1949. Dep: 08/02/1949. | ||
02/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/04/1949. Dep: 09/06/1949. | ||
09/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
15/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
22/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1950. Dep: 05/07/1950. Work undertaken: Named BALMORAL |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
25/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1951. Dep: 23/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29819 (Diagram 118) |
||
09/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/12/1952. Dep: 18/12/1952. | ||
11/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1953. Dep: 11/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29822 (Diagram 118) |
||
17/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/05/1954. Dep: 24/05/1954. | ||
28/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/10/1954. Dep: 19/11/1954. | ||
24/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1955. Dep: 25/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29813 (Diagram 118) |
||
04/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1957. Dep: 03/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29802 (Diagram 118) |
||
19/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1958. Dep: 28/05/1958. | ||
25/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/06/1958. Dep: 19/07/1958. | ||
10/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1959. Dep: 19/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29808 (Diagram 118) |
||
20/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/07/1960. Dep: 23/07/1960. | ||
16/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/02/1961. Dep: 11/03/1961. | ||
08/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1962. Dep: 01/07/1962. | ||
04/07/1962 | Modification | Diagram 118 number 29806 boiler fitted | ||
04/07/1962 | Modification | Diagram 118 number 9658 boiler fitted | ||
11/01/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60140 from York (North) (50A) |