|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 10/10/1949 | 17/10/1949 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1950 | 30/05/1950 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1950 | 29/11/1950 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1951 | 29/08/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/02/1952 | 10/03/1952 | 29 days | Heavy Casual | Named NORTH EASTERN |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/05/1952 | 27/05/1952 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1952 | 22/12/1952 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1953 | 17/06/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29825 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1954 | 03/12/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29843 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1955 | 26/04/1955 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1956 | 20/04/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29838 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1957 | 16/11/1957 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29803 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1958 | 31/07/1958 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1959 | 21/02/1959 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1959 | 18/12/1959 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29823 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1961 | 11/08/1961 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29812 (Diagram 118) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
16/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsal) | New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/04/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60147 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2066 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
10/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/10/1949. Dep: 17/10/1949. | ||
12/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/05/1950. Dep: 30/05/1950. | ||
25/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/10/1950. Dep: 29/11/1950. | ||
30/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/07/1951. Dep: 29/08/1951. | ||
29/08/1951 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
11/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/02/1952. Dep: 10/03/1952. Work undertaken: Named NORTH EASTERN |
||
06/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/05/1952. Dep: 27/05/1952. | ||
09/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/12/1952. Dep: 22/12/1952. | ||
18/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1953. Dep: 17/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29825 (Diagram 118) |
||
03/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1954. Dep: 03/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29843 (Diagram 118) |
||
19/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/04/1955. Dep: 26/04/1955. | ||
13/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1956. Dep: 20/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29838 (Diagram 118) |
||
21/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1957. Dep: 16/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29803 (Diagram 118) |
||
22/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/07/1958. Dep: 31/07/1958. | ||
14/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1959. Dep: 21/02/1959. | ||
19/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1959. Dep: 18/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29823 (Diagram 118) |
||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
03/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1961. Dep: 11/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29812 (Diagram 118) |
||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
28/08/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60147 from York (North) (50A) |