|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1950 | 13/01/1950 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1950 | 24/03/1950 | 2 days | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1950 | 03/04/1950 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1950 | 05/05/1950 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1950 | 15/06/1950 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1951 | 01/03/1951 | 53 days | Heavy Intermediate | Named BORDERER |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1952 | 20/05/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29874 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1953 | 14/10/1953 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1955 | 03/02/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29835 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1956 | 15/06/1956 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29858 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1956 | 27/11/1956 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1957 | 29/08/1957 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/02/1958 | 02/04/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 10635 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1959 | 30/10/1959 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29818 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1961 | 27/07/1961 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29870 (Diagram 118) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1963 | 12/10/1963 | 33 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 29839 (Diagram 118) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1964 | 06/03/1964 | 37 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1951 | A1 Names | 'Al' names lately affixed include: 60150 Willbrook; 60151 Midlothian (new cast chimney); 60153 Flamboyant; 60155 Borderer; 60158 Aberdonian. | SLS/195105 |
02/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) | New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196108 |
16/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/09/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60155 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2049 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
02/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/01/1950. Dep: 13/01/1950. | ||
23/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 23/03/1950. Dep: 24/03/1950. | ||
03/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 03/04/1950. Dep: 03/04/1950. | ||
01/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/05/1950. Dep: 05/05/1950. | ||
15/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 15/06/1950. Dep: 15/06/1950. | ||
08/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/01/1951. Dep: 01/03/1951. Work undertaken: Named BORDERER |
||
20/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1952. Dep: 20/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29874 (Diagram 118) |
||
20/05/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
31/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1953. Dep: 14/10/1953. | ||
03/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1955. Dep: 03/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29835 (Diagram 118) |
||
10/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1956. Dep: 15/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29858 (Diagram 118) |
||
21/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1956. Dep: 27/11/1956. | ||
30/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1957. Dep: 29/08/1957. | ||
28/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1958. Dep: 02/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10635 (Diagram 118) |
||
21/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1959. Dep: 30/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29818 (Diagram 118) |
||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
12/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1961. Dep: 27/07/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29870 (Diagram 118) |
||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
04/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
10/09/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/09/1963. Dep: 12/10/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29839 (Diagram 118) |
||
14/10/1963 | Modification | Diagram 118 number 29873 boiler fitted | ||
30/01/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/01/1964. Dep: 06/03/1964. | ||
04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60155 from York (North) (50A) |