|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 29/07/1924 | 18/08/1924 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1925 | 29/06/1926 | 231 days | General | New crank axle |
||
Gateshead Works | 26/10/1927 | 21/12/1927 | 57 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 23/01/1928 | 25/01/1928 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1929 | 16/05/1929 | 100 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 13/02/1930 | 01/03/1930 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1930 | 25/06/1930 | 112 days | General | Bronze axleboxes |
||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1930 | 20/08/1930 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1931 | 09/07/1931 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/12/1931 | 19/02/1932 | 51 days | General | Steam brake Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 47) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1933 | 04/02/1933 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1933 | 13/03/1933 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1933 | 07/11/1933 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 1602 (Diagram 47) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1934 | 23/06/1934 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1934 | 19/11/1934 | 32 days | Unclassified | 8 wheel tender |
||
Darlington Works | 29/07/1935 | 18/10/1935 | 82 days | General | Vacuum brake Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 47) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1936 | 17/03/1936 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1936 | 27/10/1936 | 36 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1936 | 15/12/1936 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1937 | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1947 | General | 'D.30' Nos. 2403 and 2404 are both running named Jeanie Deans, the former was noted on 18/1 and the latter on 25/1. | SLS/194704 |
09/02/1947 | Glasgow Area | No. 2403 was seen with the name Sir Walter Scott restored on 9/2. | SLS/194705 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/03/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2403 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1223 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 47 boiler fitted |
||
04/1924 | Naming | Named 'CITY OF DURHAM' | ||
29/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/07/1924. Dep: 18/08/1924. | ||
11/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1925. Dep: 29/06/1926. Work undertaken: New crank axle |
||
26/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1927. Dep: 21/12/1927. | ||
23/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/01/1928. Dep: 25/01/1928. | ||
06/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1929. Dep: 16/05/1929. | ||
13/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/02/1930. Dep: 01/03/1930. | ||
06/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1930. Dep: 25/06/1930. Work undertaken: Bronze axleboxes |
||
14/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/08/1930. Dep: 20/08/1930. | ||
16/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/06/1931. Dep: 09/07/1931. | ||
31/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1931. Dep: 19/02/1932. Work undertaken: Steam brake Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 47) |
||
02/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1933. Dep: 04/02/1933. | ||
02/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1933. Dep: 13/03/1933. | ||
28/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1933. Dep: 07/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1602 (Diagram 47) |
||
26/04/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
15/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934. | ||
19/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/10/1934. Dep: 19/11/1934. Work undertaken: 8 wheel tender |
||
29/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1935. Dep: 18/10/1935. Work undertaken: Vacuum brake Boiler number 1448 (Diagram 47) |
||
06/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/03/1936. Dep: 17/03/1936. | ||
22/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1936. Dep: 27/10/1936. | ||
30/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1936. Dep: 15/12/1936. | ||
04/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 04/05/1937. | ||
21/05/1937 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2403 from York (North) (YK) | ||
05/02/1938 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |