|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1931 | 23/05/1931 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1932 | 10/03/1932 | 60 days | Heavy | Boiler number 8077 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1932 | 13/05/1932 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1933 | 13/05/1933 | 55 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/06/1933 | 26/06/1933 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1934 | 04/05/1934 | 43 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/08/1934 | 01/09/1934 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27037 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1934 | 20/12/1934 | 37 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1935 | 13/07/1935 | 15 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1935 | 26/11/1935 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1936 | 26/06/1936 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1937 | 24/05/1937 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1937 | 03/12/1937 | 43 days | Heavy | Boiler number 8078 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1938 | 24/08/1938 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/06/1939 | 12/08/1939 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 27037 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/05/1940 | 29/05/1940 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1940 | 29/08/1940 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1941 | 18/06/1941 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1941 | 16/10/1941 | 60 days | Heavy | Tender number 5279 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/08/1942 | 18/08/1942 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1943 | 28/05/1943 | 46 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/08/1944 | 05/08/1944 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1945 | 02/08/1945 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1947 | 26/09/1947 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 9118 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1948 | 20/12/1948 | 45 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60094 |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1950 | 10/05/1950 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 9568 (Diagram 94HP) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1950 | 18/05/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1952 | 29/04/1952 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27076 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1953 | 20/11/1953 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1955 | 21/04/1955 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27013 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1956 | 07/04/1956 | 46 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
R & W Hawthorn | 06/10/1956 | 16/10/1956 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
R & W Hawthorn | 18/03/1957 | 22/03/1957 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1957 | 22/11/1957 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27034 (Diagram 94A) |
||
R & W Hawthorn | 05/03/1958 | 14/03/1958 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1958 | 01/01/1959 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1959 | 26/08/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27014 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5261 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1961 | 16/08/1961 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27962 (Diagram 107) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1962 | 28/01/1963 | 49 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1963 | 19/02/1963 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1963 | 04/09/1963 | 63 days | Heavy Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Ex Wks.) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
11/08/1959 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay) | Paint shop- D223, D2066, D2265, D3060, 60075/511, 61825, 73010/165; Weigh-house- D224, D2065, 60006, 61211, 62054, 63934; New Erecting shop- D2067/8/9, E5010-4, D3070, D3137/49, D3230/2/3I; Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay- 12113, 13254, D3072, 61185, 61809/62/73/903/27, 63930/48, 68904/65; Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay- 60016/20/77/90/4/129/50/536; 61210, 62057 an 63957 on south side with Service loco 4; Stripping-60038/82, 61813/39, 63965, 70000, 73163/6. Awaiting cut up- 61661, 64181/258, 68973, 69515/7/45/8/76/84; Being cut up-60700, 61627, 64246, 69536/9. For condition reports- 61623, 68974, 69526/41/91. In yard D3229 an 11160. | SLS/195909 |
16/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196109 |
14/04/1963 | St. Rollox MPD (in steam) | in steam-60004/31/94, 60955 and 60525 under repair, and stored-42877, 45119, 45718/28/9/31; ex Works-44931, 45309 an 45478. | SLS/196304 |
21/08/1963 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall Steam Bay) | New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/12/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2748, name: COLORADO Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1705 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
13/02/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
05/04/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
04/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1931. Dep: 23/05/1931. | ||
11/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/01/1932. Dep: 10/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8077 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
11/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/05/1932. Dep: 13/05/1932. | ||
20/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1933. Dep: 13/05/1933. | ||
22/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1933. Dep: 26/06/1933. | ||
23/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/03/1934. Dep: 04/05/1934. | ||
01/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1934. Dep: 01/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27037 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
14/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/11/1934. Dep: 20/12/1934. | ||
29/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/06/1935. Dep: 13/07/1935. | ||
07/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/11/1935. Dep: 26/11/1935. | ||
14/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1936. Dep: 26/06/1936. | ||
12/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1937. Dep: 24/05/1937. | ||
22/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/10/1937. Dep: 03/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8078 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
20/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1938. Dep: 24/08/1938. | ||
24/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1939. Dep: 12/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27037 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
29/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/05/1940. Dep: 29/05/1940. | ||
18/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1940. Dep: 29/08/1940. | ||
16/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1941. Dep: 18/06/1941. | ||
18/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/08/1941. Dep: 16/10/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 5279 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
10/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1942. Dep: 18/08/1942. | ||
13/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1943. Dep: 28/05/1943. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
28/05/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
02/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/08/1944. Dep: 05/08/1944. | ||
18/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1945. Dep: 02/08/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 557 but not taken up | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 94 | ||
25/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1947. Dep: 26/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9118 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
29/12/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
03/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
06/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1948. Dep: 20/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60094 |
||
28/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1950. Dep: 10/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9568 (Diagram 94HP) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
15/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/05/1950. Dep: 18/05/1950. | ||
25/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1952. Dep: 29/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27076 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
29/04/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
14/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1953. Dep: 20/11/1953. | ||
15/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1955. Dep: 21/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27013 (Diagram 94A) |
||
22/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/02/1956. Dep: 07/04/1956. | ||
06/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/10/1956. Dep: 16/10/1956. | ||
18/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/03/1957. Dep: 22/03/1957. | ||
02/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1957. Dep: 22/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27034 (Diagram 94A) |
||
05/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/03/1958. Dep: 14/03/1958. | ||
09/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/12/1958. Dep: 01/01/1959. | ||
22/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1959. Dep: 26/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27014 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5261 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
05/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1961. Dep: 16/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27962 (Diagram 107) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
13/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
18/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) | ||
10/12/1962 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor number 5567 | ||
11/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/12/1962. Dep: 28/01/1963. | ||
31/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
14/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) | ||
31/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/01/1963. Dep: 19/02/1963. | ||
04/07/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 04/07/1963. Dep: 04/09/1963. | ||
24/02/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60094 from St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |