|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1930 | 22/02/1930 | 46 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1931 | 14/05/1931 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 8254 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/02/1932 | 22/04/1932 | 54 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1932 | 05/11/1932 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1933 | 30/03/1933 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1933 | 08/04/1933 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/05/1933 | 25/05/1933 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/11/1933 | 08/01/1934 | 62 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1935 | 10/04/1935 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 8077 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1935 | 16/04/1935 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/05/1936 | 04/07/1936 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1936 | 20/07/1936 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/06/1937 | 30/07/1937 | 35 days | General | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1937 | 03/11/1937 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1938 | 11/02/1938 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1938 | 13/05/1938 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1938 | 29/10/1938 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1939 | 23/11/1939 | 55 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1941 | 29/03/1941 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 8252 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1942 | 07/08/1942 | 31 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1943 | 20/03/1943 | 41 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1944 | 27/05/1944 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1944 | 08/07/1944 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1945 | 08/06/1945 | 26 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1946 | 26/09/1946 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 9516 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1947 | 25/04/1947 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1948 | 24/06/1948 | 44 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60097 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1949 | 30/11/1949 | 38 days | General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1951 | 19/04/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27041 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1952 | 20/11/1952 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
R & W Hawthorn | 16/02/1954 | 10/03/1954 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1954 | 10/06/1954 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27020 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1955 | 31/01/1956 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27079 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/07/1957 | 19/09/1957 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 27044 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1958 | 23/12/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27067 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1960 | 02/09/1960 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27044 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1961 | 09/02/1962 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29339 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1962 | 29/11/1962 | 45 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
26/06/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works on 26/6 included; Nos. 1, 29, 30/6/9, 65/7, 104, 518, 818/83, 1083, 1128, 1800/24, 2821, 60042/49/97, 60515, 60870, 61830. The first of the new 'A.1' 4-6-2's No. 60114, was nearing completion here in early July and was being proceeded with faster than No. 60539. | SLS/194808 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
13/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsal) | New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. | SLS/196202 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
28/02/1962 | Trough defectors on Gresely A3\'s | Although Class A3 Pacific 60097 Humorist was out-shopped ex-Doncaster Works in February still retaining old type smoke deflectors, the fitting of trough-pattern deflectors continues apace and including the seven further examples given below, thirty-five locos have been equipped up to the time of writing:
|
SLS/196205 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/02/1963 | Glasgow - Aberdeen Pacific workings | The last regular workings of L.N.E.R Pacifics - during December and January, Ferryhill usually used 60009 an 60011 on the 7-10 a.m. to Glasgow (back with the 5-30 p.m.) but 60002/4/57/97/522/37 also appeared, whilst the standbies were 60527 or 60955 (rarely required). 60537 appeared on 25th January-one month after its 'withdrawal'! ' St. Rollox usually used 60027* on the 8-25 a.m. to Aberdeen (back with the 5-15 p.m.) with as standby 60031 or 60090, whilst 60012 was borrowed from Haymarket for most of November and December; other locomotives to appear were 60004/512/955/72 an 73153. * 60027 was in Grangemouth shed for repair on 11th February. | SLS/196303 | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
21/08/1963 | Doncaster Works (Yard) | New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/03/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2751, name: HUMORIST Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1709 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94HP boiler fitted |
||
10/08/1929 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5265 | ||
08/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930. | ||
24/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1931. Dep: 14/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8254 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
29/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/02/1932. Dep: 22/04/1932. | ||
01/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1932. Dep: 05/11/1932. | ||
08/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1933. Dep: 30/03/1933. | ||
07/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/04/1933. Dep: 08/04/1933. | ||
25/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1933. Dep: 25/05/1933. | ||
08/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/11/1933. Dep: 08/01/1934. | ||
26/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1935. Dep: 10/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8077 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
13/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1935. Dep: 16/04/1935. | ||
25/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936. | ||
20/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/07/1936. Dep: 20/07/1936. | ||
26/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 30/07/1937. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
01/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1937. Dep: 03/11/1937. | ||
03/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/02/1938. Dep: 11/02/1938. | ||
13/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/05/1938. Dep: 13/05/1938. | ||
30/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1938. Dep: 29/10/1938. | ||
30/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1939. Dep: 23/11/1939. | ||
26/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1941. Dep: 29/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8252 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
08/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1942. Dep: 07/08/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
07/08/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
07/08/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
08/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/02/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943. | ||
26/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944. | ||
01/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/07/1944. Dep: 08/07/1944. | ||
14/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1945. Dep: 08/06/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 560 but not taken up | ||
27/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 97 | ||
08/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1946. Dep: 26/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9516 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
21/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/04/1947. Dep: 25/04/1947. | ||
12/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1948. Dep: 24/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60097 |
||
24/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1949. Dep: 30/11/1949. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
20/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1951. Dep: 19/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27041 (Diagram 94A) |
||
14/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/10/1952. Dep: 20/11/1952. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
20/11/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
06/01/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (68E) | ||
16/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/02/1954. Dep: 10/03/1954. | ||
21/02/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
05/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1954. Dep: 10/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27020 (Diagram 94A) |
||
12/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1955. Dep: 31/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27079 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
29/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1957. Dep: 19/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27044 (Diagram 94A) |
||
18/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1958. Dep: 23/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27067 (Diagram 94A) |
||
13/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1960. Dep: 02/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27044 (Diagram 94A) |
||
13/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
29/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1961. Dep: 09/02/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29339 (Diagram 107) |
||
16/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1962. Dep: 29/11/1962. | ||
08/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
24/08/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60097 from St Margarets (64A) |