|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1935 | 03/12/1935 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1936 | 30/01/1937 | 55 days | General | Tender number 5226 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1938 | 11/03/1938 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1939 | 08/07/1939 | 60 days | General | Hudd ATC Fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/05/1940 | 05/05/1940 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1940 | 10/01/1941 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 8780 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1942 | 09/05/1942 | 37 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1943 | 04/11/1943 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1944 | 09/12/1944 | 41 days | General | Tender number 5272 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1945 | 28/10/1945 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1945 | 29/12/1945 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 9482 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1947 | 07/05/1947 | 45 days | General | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1948 | 26/11/1948 | 39 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60041 |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1950 | 07/07/1950 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9118 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1950 | 20/07/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1952 | 13/02/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 27067 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1953 | 28/05/1953 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/12/1954 | 26/01/1955 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1955 | 03/05/1955 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/09/1956 | 24/10/1956 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27082 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1957 | 22/03/1957 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1958 | 20/02/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27003 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/06/1959 | 31/07/1959 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27049 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1959 | 01/10/1959 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/02/1961 | 23/03/1961 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27020 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 31/05/1961 | 07/06/1961 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1962 | 17/01/1963 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27024 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/05/1947 | Doncaster Works | Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). | SLS/194708 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/12/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2506, name: SALMON TROUT Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1797 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor Diagram 94A boiler fitted |
||
17/10/1935 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5325 | ||
24/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1935. Dep: 03/12/1935. | ||
07/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1936. Dep: 30/01/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 5226 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
28/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1938. Dep: 11/03/1938. | ||
10/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1939. Dep: 08/07/1939. Work undertaken: Hudd ATC Fitted |
||
04/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/05/1940. Dep: 05/05/1940. | ||
27/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1940. Dep: 10/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8780 (Diagram 94A) |
||
03/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1942. Dep: 09/05/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
09/05/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
06/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1943. Dep: 04/11/1943. | ||
30/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 5272 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
17/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/10/1945. Dep: 28/10/1945. | ||
19/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9482 (Diagram 94A) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 576 but not taken up | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 41 | ||
24/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1947. Dep: 07/05/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
07/05/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
19/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1948. Dep: 26/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60041 |
||
26/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1950. Dep: 07/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9118 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
07/07/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
18/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/07/1950. Dep: 20/07/1950. | ||
16/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1952. Dep: 13/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27067 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
13/02/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
28/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1953. Dep: 28/05/1953. | ||
16/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1954. Dep: 26/01/1955. | ||
21/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/04/1955. Dep: 03/05/1955. | ||
04/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1956. Dep: 24/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27082 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
13/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/03/1957. Dep: 22/03/1957. | ||
15/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1958. Dep: 20/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27003 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
17/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1959. Dep: 31/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27049 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
18/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/09/1959. Dep: 01/10/1959. | ||
13/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
11/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1961. Dep: 23/03/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27020 (Diagram 94A) |
||
31/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/05/1961. Dep: 07/06/1961. | ||
10/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1962. Dep: 17/01/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27024 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
04/12/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60041 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
09/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |