|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1937 | 18/12/1937 | 38 days | General | Larger coal space provided Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1939 | 04/03/1939 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1940 | 16/03/1940 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1941 | 30/11/1941 | 45 days | General | Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1943 | 21/07/1943 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 8953 (Diagram 107) Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1943 | 23/11/1943 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1944 | 04/10/1944 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/09/1945 | 20/09/1945 | 18 days | Light Repair | Tender number 5330 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1946 | 04/05/1946 | 41 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 25 |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1946 | 13/12/1946 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1947 | 31/12/1947 | 41 days | General | Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/12/1949 | 27/01/1950 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 8961 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60025 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1950 | 01/12/1950 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1951 | 11/07/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29291 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1952 | 06/12/1952 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | Long guard irons removed Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1953 | 04/05/1953 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1954 | 14/04/1954 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29273 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1955 | 27/01/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1955 | 05/10/1955 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29282 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1956 | 16/08/1956 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1957 | 08/03/1957 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1957 | 10/05/1957 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29278 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1958 | 29/01/1958 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/07/1958 | 04/09/1958 | 46 days | General | Double chinmey fitted Boiler number 29295 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5648 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1959 | 17/04/1959 | 44 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1960 | 16/06/1960 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29338 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1960 | 04/01/1961 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1961 | 09/11/1961 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/12/1961 | 20/01/1962 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1962 | 20/06/1962 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 29331 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/02/1963 | 13/03/1963 | 30 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/06/1949 | Inverurie Works | Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 61502, 4484, 5232/57, 65281, 5307, 65340. ex L.M.S. No. 4251. | SLS/194907 |
17/09/1956 | The Talisman | Over the early part of September 1956, thoughts of many people who are interested in the East Coast Route have been returning to that unforgettable day 21 years ago-27/9/1935. On this day the 'Silver Jubilee' express train, then a startling innovation in rail travel, made its public. debut. A few days earlier many of us had risen early in the morning to go and look at the brand new streamlined A4 Pacific ' Silver Link,' which had come up from Doncaster to Kings Cross and was running in on an early morning Cambridge train. Our reactions to the new style outline and the silver grey colouring were mixed and although we had unbounded confidence in Sir Nigel Gresley, the events of that epoch-making day exceeded our wildest dreams. There is no need to recount in detail the trial trip. Suffice to say that 'Silver Link' in the capable hands of Driver Arthur Taylor achieved a record for steam traction that has never been approached before or since and Great Western invincibility was shattered for all time. No less than 43 miles were covered at an average speed of 100 m.p.h. and a maximum of 112½ m.p.h. was twice attained between Hitchin and St. Neots. Ingrained in one's memory is the triumphant return of the train to Kings Cross in the early evening, where hosts of newspaper reporters were assembled. As the great engine came to a stand in platform 4, Sir Nigel Gresley descended from the footplate, waving his famous chronograph 'of vast dimensions,' as it has been described, crying '112 miles an hour, 112 miles an hour!' Since that day, of course, the A4 Pacifics have achieved many things which will live in history. Now, after less fortunate days in railway history, the Eastern Region of British Railways has introduced a new express between London and Edinburgh and named it 'The Talisman.' This new service leaves each capital city at 4-0 p.m. on Mondays to Fridays, reaching the end of its 393 mile journey, after one stop at Newcastle, in 6 hours 40 minutes. The train consists of eight coaches, including one of the fine first class twins formerly used on the 'Coronation,' all painted in the recently adopted dark red shade. The tare weight of this train is 274 tons. In the weeks preceding the inaugural runs, on 17th September, there had been much speculation as to what engines would be employed. Few genuinely interested observers doubted that A4's would be selected, and so it proved. The arrangements are that Kings Cross takes the 4-0, p.m. down to Newcastle and hands over there to Haymarket off the 4-0 p.m. ex Edinburgh, the up train being worked from Newcastle to London by Gateshead engines and men. Present day operating troubles had aroused doubts as to whether the new service could be run to time, so the outcome of the first day's runs are interesting to relate. On the down run, Kings Cross provided 60025 'Falcon,' with driver P. Heavens and notwithstanding eight signal checks they made a gross time of 271¼ minutes to Newcastle. Here 60031 'Golden Plover' took over for the final 124½ miles to Edinburgh, which were covered in 123¼ minutes with two relaying and two signal checks. Coming southwards the inital run was made by 60019 'Bittern' and several checks resulted in a 5 minute late arrival after a very fast finish. The second up run on 18th September was fully covered by recorders who had gone down the first day and they were not disappointed; 60031 having run them to Newcastle in slightly over 126 minutes, after delays amounting to 7 minutes, they were then treated to a truly great performance by driver Kipling of Gateshead on 60018 'Sparrow Hawk.' Three dead stands, three signal checks and four relaying checks were encountered and still the train was 4 minutes early into Kings Cross, giving a nett time of only 236 minutes for the 268¼ miles or only 1 minutes longer than allowed in pre-war days on the 'Coronation.' Allowing for the fact that driver Kipling is a stranger to the section Grantham-London, which was run in darkness, we may truly say to him 'Tis a far, far better thing you have done than you have ever done before.' |
SLS/195611 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Boiler Park) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
13/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. | SLS/196202 |
10/03/1963 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. | SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 | Worcester Works (Erecting Shop) | 4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/01/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4484, name: FALCON Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1849 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Corridor Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
11/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1937. Dep: 18/12/1937. Work undertaken: Larger coal space provided Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
19/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1939. Dep: 04/03/1939. | ||
04/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
30/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1940. Dep: 16/03/1940. | ||
17/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1941. Dep: 30/11/1941. Work undertaken: Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
30/11/1941 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
07/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1943. Dep: 21/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8953 (Diagram 107) Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
21/07/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
28/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/10/1943. Dep: 23/11/1943. | ||
21/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1944. Dep: 04/10/1944. | ||
03/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/09/1945. Dep: 20/09/1945. Work undertaken: Tender number 5330 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 586 but not taken up | ||
25/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 25 |
||
14/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/11/1946. Dep: 13/12/1946. | ||
21/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1947. Dep: 31/12/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
31/12/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
11/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
17/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
16/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1949. Dep: 27/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8961 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60025 |
||
19/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
25/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
19/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
31/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
20/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1950. Dep: 01/12/1950. | ||
04/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1951. Dep: 11/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29291 (Diagram 107) |
||
03/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/11/1952. Dep: 06/12/1952. Work undertaken: Long guard irons removed Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
06/12/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
14/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/04/1953. Dep: 04/05/1953. | ||
11/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1954. Dep: 14/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29273 (Diagram 107) |
||
24/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1955. Dep: 27/01/1955. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
24/05/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5590 | ||
26/07/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5330 | ||
22/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1955. Dep: 05/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29282 (Diagram 107) |
||
09/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/08/1956. Dep: 16/08/1956. | ||
01/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/03/1957. Dep: 08/03/1957. | ||
01/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1957. Dep: 10/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29278 (Diagram 107) |
||
15/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/01/1958. Dep: 29/01/1958. | ||
21/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1958. Dep: 04/09/1958. Work undertaken: Double chinmey fitted Boiler number 29295 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5648 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
05/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/03/1959. Dep: 17/04/1959. | ||
05/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1960. Dep: 16/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29338 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
12/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/12/1960. Dep: 04/01/1961. | ||
17/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/10/1961. Dep: 09/11/1961. | ||
28/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/12/1961. Dep: 20/01/1962. | ||
26/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1962. Dep: 20/06/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29331 (Diagram 107) |
||
12/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/02/1963. Dep: 13/03/1963. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
20/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60025 from New England (34E) | ||
04/01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |