|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 29/10/1937 | 08/12/1937 | 41 days | General | Larger coal space provided Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1938 | 02/01/1939 | 52 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/07/1939 | 25/08/1939 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/12/1939 | 04/01/1940 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1940 | 04/05/1940 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 9127 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1941 | 18/01/1942 | 49 days | General | Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/02/1943 | 06/03/1943 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1943 | 12/09/1943 | 35 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1944 | 04/02/1944 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1944 | 12/01/1945 | 59 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1946 | 18/04/1946 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 8955 (Diagram 107) Painted Wartime unlined black Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 587 |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1947 | 05/03/1947 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1947 | 01/11/1947 | 44 days | General | Renamed Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. De-named KESTREL |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1949 | 20/05/1949 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1949 | 23/09/1949 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 8948 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60026 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1950 | 30/10/1950 | 7 days | Light Repair | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1951 | 26/07/1951 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29310 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1952 | 24/10/1952 | 26 days | General | Tender number 5675 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1953 | 20/02/1953 | 7 days | Light Casual | Long guard irons removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1953 | 22/04/1953 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1954 | 24/09/1954 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29314 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1955 | 12/05/1955 | 39 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1955 | 30/08/1955 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1956 | 09/03/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29318 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/06/1957 | 15/08/1957 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 29282 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1958 | 16/01/1959 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 29327 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1960 | 02/04/1960 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/09/1960 | 21/10/1960 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27972 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1961 | 05/04/1961 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1962 | 24/02/1962 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1962 | 01/08/1962 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 29327 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/08/1962 | 20/09/1962 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1963 | 09/04/1963 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Inverurie Works | 07/05/1965 | 10/05/1965 | 4 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/02/1953 | Good timekeeping | Timekeeping on this section has been very commendable during recent bad weather months. On (16/2) A4 60013 on the 8 a.m. to Leeds passed Potters Bar on miles) in exactly 15 mins., going fast. On (19/2) the same train, engine and crew cut 5 minutes from the 39 minute schedule to Hitchin, start to stop. On (27/2) the Up Tees Tyne Pullman, behind A4 60026 arrived at Kings X at 1.53½, 14½ minutes early. Regular observers do not agree that the Cleethorpes train is the best timekeeper in this part of the world. The Up Yorkshire Pullman is quoted as being a better example; worked by a Copley Hill A1 this train is consistently as much as 5 or 6 minutes early, and hardly ever late. The Up Tees Tyne is probably a close runner up. | SLS/195306 |
11/07/1953 | Kings Cross failures | A sudden spate of failures early in the month put Kings X loco. in a spot; Nos. 60006/7/15/26 were some of the worst casualties, and of these only 60015 has yet returned to traffic. 60010/3/21/30 have also been missing during this period, involving much double-tripping for those left running to the extent of over 500 miles in less than twelve hours in some cases. Other failures include the occasion when Driver Howard (that star of television) had to leave 60007 at Hatfield and bring the Up Tees-Tyne into Kings X behind an N2, complete with headboard. Oh, shame ! The Tees-Tyne suffered again on 29/7/53 when 60033 came off at Hitchin with a hot R. hand driving box; 61097 substituted and the train was 16 mins. late on arrival. On 25/7 60029 on the Up Scotsman came off with a warm trailing pony truck at Hatfield and an N2 again took over. | SLS/195310 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop-60162 (64B), 60003 (34A), 60035 (64B), 60017 (34A), 60145 (52A), 60103 (34A), 62030 (52C), 73000 (41B), 73155 (41C), 61122 (36A), 61971 (32A), 61889 (31B), 61820 (30F), 61890 (31B), 68987 (34B), 61162 (36A), 61846 (53A), 61409 (40B), 60001 (52A), 61158 (36A), 60526/502 (50A), 60039 (34A), 60152 (64B), 60026 (34A), 60520 (34F). Paint Shop-D3321 (52B), D3148 (51L), D5308 (34B), D6101/2 (34B), 60117 (56C), 61925 (36A), 60160 (64B), 62032 (31B). Yard-70030 (32A), 68914 (56B), 73016 (41C), 63940 (34F), D3079 (53A), 60508 (34E), 11182 (40A), 63975 (36A), 60063 (34F), 60095 (12C), 61816 (31B), 61406 (40B). Diesel Shop-E5001/2 motors in, D2050/1 motors in, 11106 (51C), 13147/51 (51L). Withdrawn-64216/7, 61606/48/22, 69493, 67397, 69544, 64201/74/6, 69551, 69593, 64205/49, 64183. | SLS/195902 |
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsall) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Weigh House) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
26/10/1963 | Ex-Haymarket A4\'s | During w/e 26/10, A4s 60006/7/10/17/26/32/4 arrived at St. Margarets from the south. 60006/7 have since moved on to Dalry Rd., 60010 to Ferryhill and 60026/34 to Bathgate for storage. After a few day's work from St. Margarets 60017/32 were to be returned south for scrapping. | SLS/196311 |
11/12/1966 | Crewe Works (Traverser area) | Erecting shop-44672, 45092, 70013/4, 90243/81/300, 92009/203/220, 60007/10, D319, D339, D1111, D1585, D1607/15/21/2/3/9, D1701/28/39/67/77/8/85/8/93, D8005, E3014/6/22/3/6/34/5/45, E26038/52, E27003/6, E5015/6. Paint shop area-44665/889, 90081/362, E3001/15/36, D239, D375, D1107/8/10, D1523, D1662, D1954, D5709. Diesel shop-D214/24, D364/81. D1509/15/21/4/35, D1600/56, D1700, D1842, D1901/49/81, D5718. Electric shop-E26029/50, E3171, D1618. Test area-D1109, D1691, D1864, D5717. Traverser area-D322, D251, D1722/89, D1860, D1942, E3002/29, D5715, 60026, 71000, 90664. Old cutting up shop-D5704. Side of Works-70017, 45138, 90345/406, E3089, D5710. | SLS/196701 |
08/01/1967 | Crewe Works (Traverser area) | Erecting shop-60007/10, 70013, 92220, D293, D388, D1505/7/23/92, D1622/30, D1728/56/74/81/91/7/8, D1805/37, D5711, D8005/43, E3001/2/14/6/22/3/6/9/45/6/68, E3100/99, E5023, E5015(E6101), E5016 (E6102), E5006(E6103). Old Paint shop-D249, D1102/9/10/1/5/94, D5709, D8061, E3064, E5019, 92009. Side of Works-D5710/3, 90243/81. Traverser area-D233, D1525, D1619, D1751, D1977, D5715, D8017, 60026, 71000. New shop-D251, D284, D332, D346, D364, D366, D1513/68/79, D1617, D1750, D1925/43. Electric shop-E3171, E26050. New Paint shop: D1621/9, D1758/77. No sign of E5024-the conversions appear to be having completely new bodies apart from cabs and are somewhat lengthened in appearance. | SLS/196702 |
19/02/1967 | Crewe Works (Traverser Area) | Erecting shop-D1506/9/17, D1605/26/33/98, D1744/54/65/70/94/9, D1802, E3002/13/26/45/6/68/70/1, E3131/52/63/99, D213/81/2, D382, D8054, E5003, E6101/2/3/4/5, E26018/25. Traverser Area-D1501/5/12/5/88, 60026, 71000, E3025/79, D385, D8003. New shop-D390, D1514/8/9/73/89, D1635/94, D1736/53/9, D1851, D1948, D8123/38 (damaged). New paint shop-60007/10, 92220. Old paint shop area-90243/81, E26033, D378, D1596, D1852, D8048, E3016/105. | SLS/196704 |
18/06/1967 | Crewe Works (Works yard) | Erecting shop-E3005/12/47/57/60/9/78/97, E3121/39, E6101-7, D245, D258, D376/7, D1511/30, D1646/57/61/73, D1804/77/8/95, D8010; New shop-D221, D326, D1503/17/21, D1712/4/54, D1879, D5705, D8040/66; Works yard-D5703, 60026; Outside Paint shop-D230, D1537, D1640, E3118; Traverser area-D206, D240, D304, D342, D1508, D1514, D1642/77, D1747, D1846/7/50/4/9/63/70, D1972, D8004/46/67. Old cutting-up shop-D322; New Paint shop-E3074/96, E26014, 92220. Stored Works-D2708/11/9/22/41/2/3, D2900/01/2. | SLS/196708 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/02/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4485, name: KESTREL Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1850 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Corridor Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
08/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
29/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1937. Dep: 08/12/1937. Work undertaken: Larger coal space provided Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
08/12/1937 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
22/01/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
12/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1938. Dep: 02/01/1939. | ||
09/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
24/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/07/1939. Dep: 25/08/1939. | ||
16/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/12/1939. Dep: 04/01/1940. | ||
12/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9127 (Diagram 107) |
||
01/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1941. Dep: 18/01/1942. Work undertaken: Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
18/01/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
04/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/02/1943. Dep: 06/03/1943. | ||
08/08/1943 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5329 | ||
09/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1943. Dep: 12/09/1943. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
12/09/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
08/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/01/1944. Dep: 04/02/1944. | ||
15/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1944. Dep: 12/01/1945. | ||
09/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 18/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8955 (Diagram 107) Painted Wartime unlined black Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 587 |
||
18/04/1946 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 26 | ||
05/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1947. Dep: 05/03/1947. | ||
19/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1947. Dep: 01/11/1947. Work undertaken: Renamed Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. De-named KESTREL |
||
27/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
01/11/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
11/11/1947 | Naming | Renamed 'MILES BEEVOR' | ||
26/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
11/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
16/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/05/1949. Dep: 20/05/1949. | ||
11/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1949. Dep: 23/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8948 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60026 |
||
24/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/10/1950. Dep: 30/10/1950. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
12/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1951. Dep: 26/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29310 (Diagram 107) |
||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
29/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1952. Dep: 24/10/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 5675 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
14/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1953. Dep: 20/02/1953. Work undertaken: Long guard irons removed |
||
07/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/04/1953. Dep: 22/04/1953. | ||
01/06/1953 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5329 | ||
20/01/1954 | Tender | Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5642 | ||
16/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1954. Dep: 24/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29314 (Diagram 107) |
||
04/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 04/04/1955. Dep: 12/05/1955. | ||
30/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/08/1955. Dep: 30/08/1955. | ||
31/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1956. Dep: 09/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29318 (Diagram 107) |
||
27/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1957. Dep: 15/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29282 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
27/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1958. Dep: 16/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29327 (Diagram 107) |
||
15/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1960. Dep: 02/04/1960. | ||
10/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1960. Dep: 21/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27972 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
08/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1961. Dep: 05/04/1961. | ||
01/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/02/1962. Dep: 24/02/1962. | ||
04/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1962. Dep: 01/08/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29327 (Diagram 107) |
||
17/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/08/1962. Dep: 20/09/1962. | ||
12/03/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/03/1963. Dep: 09/04/1963. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
20/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
13/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow) | ||
07/05/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/05/1965. Dep: 10/05/1965. | ||
21/12/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60026 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
09/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |