|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1938 | 04/01/1938 | 2 days | Light Repair | Collision damage |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1939 | 21/04/1939 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1939 | 19/08/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/09/1939 | 15/09/1939 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1940 | 24/08/1940 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/09/1940 | 21/10/1940 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/12/1940 | 23/01/1941 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 9025 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/08/1941 | 06/09/1941 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1941 | 14/11/1941 | 54 days | General | Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1943 | 22/05/1943 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9018 (Diagram 107) Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1945 | 21/07/1945 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1947 | 07/03/1947 | 46 days | General | Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1948 | 14/10/1948 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 8952 (Diagram 107) Renumbered to BR 60019 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1950 | 28/07/1950 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 8905 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1950 | 11/08/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1952 | 12/02/1952 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29317 (Diagram 107) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1953 | 12/06/1953 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29298 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1954 | 30/11/1954 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29279 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1956 | 25/05/1956 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29320 (Diagram ) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/07/1957 | 06/09/1957 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29315 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1958 | 31/05/1958 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1958 | 13/12/1958 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29319 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1959 | 25/02/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1960 | 16/03/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29335 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1962 | 27/04/1962 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 27971 (Diagram 107) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/10/1964 | 05/10/1964 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1965 | 24/03/1965 | 52 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 29332 (Diagram 107) |
||
Inverurie Works | 07/05/1965 | 14/05/1965 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/03/1966 | 07/04/1966 | 10 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives under repair here on 1/10 included Nos. 8, 37, 87, 98, 516/19, 1092, 1107/09/12/24, 60007/18/19/20/60, 60635 an 61120. | SLS/194811 |
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
17/09/1956 | The Talisman | Over the early part of September 1956, thoughts of many people who are interested in the East Coast Route have been returning to that unforgettable day 21 years ago-27/9/1935. On this day the 'Silver Jubilee' express train, then a startling innovation in rail travel, made its public. debut. A few days earlier many of us had risen early in the morning to go and look at the brand new streamlined A4 Pacific ' Silver Link,' which had come up from Doncaster to Kings Cross and was running in on an early morning Cambridge train. Our reactions to the new style outline and the silver grey colouring were mixed and although we had unbounded confidence in Sir Nigel Gresley, the events of that epoch-making day exceeded our wildest dreams. There is no need to recount in detail the trial trip. Suffice to say that 'Silver Link' in the capable hands of Driver Arthur Taylor achieved a record for steam traction that has never been approached before or since and Great Western invincibility was shattered for all time. No less than 43 miles were covered at an average speed of 100 m.p.h. and a maximum of 112½ m.p.h. was twice attained between Hitchin and St. Neots. Ingrained in one's memory is the triumphant return of the train to Kings Cross in the early evening, where hosts of newspaper reporters were assembled. As the great engine came to a stand in platform 4, Sir Nigel Gresley descended from the footplate, waving his famous chronograph 'of vast dimensions,' as it has been described, crying '112 miles an hour, 112 miles an hour!' Since that day, of course, the A4 Pacifics have achieved many things which will live in history. Now, after less fortunate days in railway history, the Eastern Region of British Railways has introduced a new express between London and Edinburgh and named it 'The Talisman.' This new service leaves each capital city at 4-0 p.m. on Mondays to Fridays, reaching the end of its 393 mile journey, after one stop at Newcastle, in 6 hours 40 minutes. The train consists of eight coaches, including one of the fine first class twins formerly used on the 'Coronation,' all painted in the recently adopted dark red shade. The tare weight of this train is 274 tons. In the weeks preceding the inaugural runs, on 17th September, there had been much speculation as to what engines would be employed. Few genuinely interested observers doubted that A4's would be selected, and so it proved. The arrangements are that Kings Cross takes the 4-0, p.m. down to Newcastle and hands over there to Haymarket off the 4-0 p.m. ex Edinburgh, the up train being worked from Newcastle to London by Gateshead engines and men. Present day operating troubles had aroused doubts as to whether the new service could be run to time, so the outcome of the first day's runs are interesting to relate. On the down run, Kings Cross provided 60025 'Falcon,' with driver P. Heavens and notwithstanding eight signal checks they made a gross time of 271¼ minutes to Newcastle. Here 60031 'Golden Plover' took over for the final 124½ miles to Edinburgh, which were covered in 123¼ minutes with two relaying and two signal checks. Coming southwards the inital run was made by 60019 'Bittern' and several checks resulted in a 5 minute late arrival after a very fast finish. The second up run on 18th September was fully covered by recorders who had gone down the first day and they were not disappointed; 60031 having run them to Newcastle in slightly over 126 minutes, after delays amounting to 7 minutes, they were then treated to a truly great performance by driver Kipling of Gateshead on 60018 'Sparrow Hawk.' Three dead stands, three signal checks and four relaying checks were encountered and still the train was 4 minutes early into Kings Cross, giving a nett time of only 236 minutes for the 268¼ miles or only 1 minutes longer than allowed in pre-war days on the 'Coronation.' Allowing for the fact that driver Kipling is a stranger to the section Grantham-London, which was run in darkness, we may truly say to him 'Tis a far, far better thing you have done than you have ever done before.' |
SLS/195611 |
05/01/1966 | The A4s in Scotland | A4s ceased to work the Glasgow-Aberdeen three-hour trains with effect from the 1730 Glasgow to Aberdeen on Wednesday, 5th January. On this date en route back to Aberdeen 60019 worked the 1700 Glasgow-Dundee while D6101 worked the 1730. The only A4 booked job remaining is the 1330 Aberdeen-Glasgow returning with the 2300 Glasgow-Aberdeen. This is expected to cease, just as soon as another re-engined NB Loco Type 2 Diesel is made available. | SLS/196602 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/12/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4464, name: BITTERN Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1866 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Livery applied: Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
03/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1938. Dep: 04/01/1938. Work undertaken: Collision damage |
||
02/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1939. Dep: 21/04/1939. | ||
08/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1939. Dep: 19/08/1939. | ||
02/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/09/1939. Dep: 15/09/1939. | ||
24/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 24/08/1940. Dep: 24/08/1940. | ||
09/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1940. Dep: 21/10/1940. | ||
27/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1940. Dep: 23/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9025 (Diagram 107) |
||
20/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/08/1941. Dep: 06/09/1941. | ||
22/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1941. Dep: 14/11/1941. Work undertaken: Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
14/11/1941 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
10/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1943. Dep: 22/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9018 (Diagram 107) Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
22/05/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
05/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1945. Dep: 21/07/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 603 but not taken up | ||
16/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 19 | ||
21/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1947. Dep: 07/03/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
07/03/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
25/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1948. Dep: 14/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8952 (Diagram 107) Renumbered to BR 60019 |
||
15/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1950. Dep: 28/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8905 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
08/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/08/1950. Dep: 11/08/1950. | ||
08/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1952. Dep: 12/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29317 (Diagram 107) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
12/02/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
05/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1953. Dep: 12/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29298 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
25/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1954. Dep: 30/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29279 (Diagram 107) |
||
14/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1956. Dep: 25/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29320 (Diagram ) |
||
31/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1957. Dep: 06/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29315 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
16/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/05/1958. Dep: 31/05/1958. | ||
30/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1958. Dep: 13/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29319 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
20/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/02/1959. Dep: 25/02/1959. | ||
08/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1960. Dep: 16/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29335 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
12/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1962. Dep: 27/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27971 (Diagram 107) |
||
28/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
10/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow) | ||
05/10/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/10/1964. Dep: 05/10/1964. | ||
01/02/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/02/1965. Dep: 24/03/1965. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29332 (Diagram 107) |
||
07/05/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/05/1965. Dep: 14/05/1965. | ||
29/03/1966 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/03/1966. Dep: 07/04/1966. | ||
05/09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60019 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |