|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1938 | 15/07/1938 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1939 | 14/03/1939 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1939 | 09/06/1939 | 56 days | General | Tender number 5642 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1940 | 27/12/1940 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 8951 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1941 | 01/02/1941 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1942 | 14/09/1942 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 9024 (Diagram 107) Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1943 | 15/11/1943 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1944 | 15/07/1944 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1945 | 26/10/1945 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1946 | 06/02/1946 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1947 | 10/12/1947 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 29280 (Diagram 107) Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1948 | 25/02/1948 | 34 days | Light Repair | Tender number 5332 (LNER Corridor) attached. To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1948 | 24/03/1948 | 4 days | Unclassified | Renumbered to BR 60034 De-named PEREGRINE Named LORD FARINGDON |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/08/1948 | 29/08/1948 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1949 | 04/05/1949 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/10/1950 | 04/12/1950 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/06/1952 | 07/08/1952 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29283 (Diagram 107) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/10/1952 | 11/11/1952 | 12 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1953 | 07/02/1953 | 7 days | Unclassified | Long guard irons removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1953 | 13/01/1954 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29270 (Diagram 107) |
||
Stratford Works | 22/06/1954 | 27/06/1954 | 6 days | Light Casual | Tender only |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1955 | 04/02/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1955 | 21/05/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29295 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1956 | 10/11/1956 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29300 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1956 | 20/11/1956 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/05/1957 | 31/05/1957 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1957 | 27/08/1957 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1957 | 29/01/1958 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 29311 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1959 | 14/05/1959 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29333 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/09/1960 | 02/11/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29327 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1961 | 26/07/1961 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1962 | 01/06/1962 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27964 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1963 | 21/01/1963 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1963 | 07/03/1963 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1965 | 21/04/1965 | 101 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Doncaster Works | Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. | SLS/194805 |
31/05/1948 | Locomotive Trials 1948 | No. 60034 Lord Faringdon was the ex L.N.E.R. 'A4' 'Pacific' used in the trials on the Euston-Carlisle section, and on all four down trips was observed on time at Crewe. The two ex L.M.S. locomotives to be tested between Waterloo and Exeter are to be equipped with ex W.D. 5000 gallon tenders. Class '7P' 4-6-2 No. 46236 is to receive tender No. 79294 and Class '6P' 4-6-0 No. 46154 tender No. 79254. Both tenders are believed to have come from Swindon | SLS/194807 |
04/07/1948 | Locomotives Trials | Trialed on the ex L.N.E.R. Southern Area up to 4/7, have been: 'A.4' Nos. 22, 60033/34 and 'B.1' Nos. 61251/66. | SLS/194808 |
30/04/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in Works during April included Nos. 13, 17, 60033/34, 56, 69, 91, 60527, 802/07/96, 911/28/34/54, while those ex the Paint Shop included Nos. 60004/10/27/28/55 an 60100. As yet there is not any sign of either the new blue or green paint being used. | SLS/194906 |
06/09/1952 | G.N. Section | The summer service ended without a failure on the 'Capitals' as far as Kings X were concerned, but there were two failures from the Edinburgh end, unfortunately. After an unbroken spell of over five weeks No. 60027 ran hot during week ended 16/8/52, north of York. The scheme by which the Kings X men were to take their own engines did not work out as planned, only five out of eleven weeks being-so worked, the remainder were shared by Nos. 60017/33/34. In fact, of these three, No. 60033 ran over 10,000 miles during one period of four weeks, though even this was probably exceeded by No. 60027 during the first four weeks of the summer service. Ten of the older J52's at Hornsey are to be exchanged for a similar number of J50's from Doncaster and other sheds, in the near future. A J50 was recently tried out on the trip workings from Hornsey to the Southern Region and the transfers are possibly the result of the success of those tests. A Diesel was also tried on these trips, but no more are expected at Hornsey for the time being. The withdrawal has been announced of B17 61628 Harewood House this being the first of its class to be withdrawn and, incidentally, the first Gresley 3-cylinder class to feel the axe, apart from the A4 which was destroyed by a bomb during the war. No. 61628 was built at Darlington in 1931 as 2828, renumbered 1628 in 9/46 and 61628 in 1/49. |
SLS/195211 |
16/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196109 |
26/10/1963 | Ex-Haymarket A4\'s | During w/e 26/10, A4s 60006/7/10/17/26/32/4 arrived at St. Margarets from the south. 60006/7 have since moved on to Dalry Rd., 60010 to Ferryhill and 60026/34 to Bathgate for storage. After a few day's work from St. Margarets 60017/32 were to be returned south for scrapping. | SLS/196311 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/07/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4903, name: PEREGRINE Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1877 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
13/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/07/1938. Dep: 15/07/1938. | ||
13/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/03/1939. Dep: 14/03/1939. | ||
15/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1939. Dep: 09/06/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 5642 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
12/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1940. Dep: 27/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8951 (Diagram 107) |
||
07/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/01/1941. Dep: 01/02/1941. | ||
25/07/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
08/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1942. Dep: 14/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9024 (Diagram 107) Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
14/09/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
05/10/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
19/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1943. Dep: 15/11/1943. | ||
11/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1944. Dep: 15/07/1944. | ||
16/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1945. Dep: 26/10/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 613 but not taken up | ||
22/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1946. Dep: 06/02/1946. | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 34 | ||
15/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1947. Dep: 10/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29280 (Diagram 107) Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
23/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/01/1948. Dep: 25/02/1948. Work undertaken: Tender number 5332 (LNER Corridor) attached. To 75% Cut-off |
||
21/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/03/1948. Dep: 24/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60034 De-named PEREGRINE Named LORD FARINGDON |
||
11/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
17/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
03/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/08/1948. Dep: 29/08/1948. | ||
16/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1949. Dep: 04/05/1949. | ||
23/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/10/1950. Dep: 04/12/1950. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
24/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1952. Dep: 07/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29283 (Diagram 107) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
07/08/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
31/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/10/1952. Dep: 11/11/1952. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
01/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/02/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953. Work undertaken: Long guard irons removed |
||
28/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1953. Dep: 13/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29270 (Diagram 107) |
||
28/05/1954 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5325 | ||
22/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/06/1954. Dep: 27/06/1954. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
02/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1955. Dep: 04/02/1955. | ||
16/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1955. Dep: 21/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29295 (Diagram 107) |
||
02/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1956. Dep: 10/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29300 (Diagram 107) |
||
19/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/11/1956. Dep: 20/11/1956. | ||
29/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/05/1957. Dep: 31/05/1957. | ||
19/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/08/1957. Dep: 27/08/1957. | ||
10/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1957. Dep: 29/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29311 (Diagram 107) |
||
10/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1959. Dep: 14/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29333 (Diagram 107) |
||
26/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1960. Dep: 02/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29327 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
11/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/07/1961. Dep: 26/07/1961. | ||
12/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1962. Dep: 01/06/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27964 (Diagram 107) |
||
14/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/01/1963. Dep: 21/01/1963. | ||
28/01/1963 | Tender | Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5640 | ||
06/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/02/1963. Dep: 07/03/1963. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
20/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
17/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow) | ||
11/01/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/01/1965. Dep: 21/04/1965. | ||
10/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth | ||
24/08/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60034 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
24/08/1966 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5329 |