|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 03/06/1916 | 19/08/1916 | 78 days | General | Robinson superheater boiler Boiler number 1624 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1921 | 04/02/1922 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 138 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1922 | 02/09/1922 | 22 days | Light Repair | New cylinders |
||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1924 | 11/10/1924 | 116 days | General | Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5167 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1926 | 28/08/1926 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/07/1927 | 21/01/1928 | 187 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1928 | 18/08/1928 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1930 | 29/11/1930 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 983 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1932 | 09/07/1932 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1933 | 15/07/1933 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 719 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1935 | 16/03/1935 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22353 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1936 | 25/07/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 799 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1937 | 09/10/1937 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 941 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1939 | 22/04/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 392 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/07/1941 | 16/08/1941 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3853 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1942 | 02/01/1943 | 103 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1944 | 14/10/1944 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1946 | 14/09/1946 | 127 days | General | New frames & cylinders Boiler number 3866 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1948 | 05/06/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3861 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69802 |
||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1949 | 10/12/1949 | 39 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1952 | 09/02/1952 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 22382 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1954 | 03/07/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22370 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1955 | 15/09/1955 | 94 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1958 | 01/03/1958 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 22381 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1958 | 05/03/1958 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/12/1958 | 24/12/1958 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/05/1911 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 167 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
03/06/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1916. Dep: 19/08/1916. Work undertaken: Robinson superheater boiler Boiler number 1624 (Diagram 18) |
||
26/11/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1921. Dep: 04/02/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 138 (Diagram 18) |
||
12/08/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/08/1922. Dep: 02/09/1922. Work undertaken: New cylinders |
||
18/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1924. Dep: 11/10/1924. Work undertaken: Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5167 |
||
20/11/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
05/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1926. Dep: 28/08/1926. | ||
19/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1927. Dep: 21/01/1928. | ||
15/02/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
23/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 18/08/1928. | ||
12/09/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
18/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1930. Dep: 29/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 983 (Diagram 18) |
||
04/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1932. Dep: 09/07/1932. | ||
17/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1933. Dep: 15/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 719 (Diagram 18) |
||
16/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1935. Dep: 16/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22353 (Diagram 18) |
||
27/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1936. Dep: 25/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 799 (Diagram 18) |
||
04/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1937. Dep: 09/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 941 (Diagram 18) |
||
25/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1939. Dep: 22/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 392 (Diagram 18) |
||
09/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1941. Dep: 16/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3853 (Diagram 18) |
||
22/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1942. Dep: 02/01/1943. | ||
30/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18) |
||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9802 | ||
11/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946. Work undertaken: New frames & cylinders Boiler number 3866 (Diagram 18) |
||
08/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3861 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69802 |
||
02/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/11/1949. Dep: 10/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18) |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (51K) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (51K) | ||
19/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
25/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
03/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1952. Dep: 09/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22382 (Diagram 18) |
||
22/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22370 (Diagram 18) |
||
09/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bridlington (53D) | ||
29/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
14/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/06/1955. Dep: 15/09/1955. | ||
30/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1958. Dep: 01/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22381 (Diagram 18) |
||
03/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/03/1958. Dep: 05/03/1958. | ||
24/12/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69802 from Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
24/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 24/12/1958. Dep: 24/12/1958. | ||
06/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |