|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/10/1917 | 01/12/1917 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1419 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1921 | 04/02/1922 | 99 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1922 | 09/04/1922 | 1 day | Light Repair | Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1923 | 25/08/1923 | 148 days | General | Boiler number 414 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/11/1925 | 30/01/1926 | 71 days | General | Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5452 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/04/1928 | 16/06/1928 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1930 | 15/11/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 558 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/07/1934 | 11/08/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1825 (Diagram 18) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1937 | 16/10/1937 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 718 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/10/1937 | 30/10/1937 | 1 day | Light Repair | Trip cock gear fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1939 | 09/12/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 846 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1941 | 24/01/1942 | 40 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1943 | 11/12/1943 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1945 | 03/03/1945 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1946 | 30/03/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 149 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1947 | 25/10/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22353 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1949 | 11/01/1950 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3849 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69812 |
||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1950 | 08/07/1950 | 32 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1951 | 29/12/1951 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 22383 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/01/1952 | 04/01/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/10/1952 | 25/10/1952 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 10/07/1954 | 18/09/1954 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 22382 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1957 | 12/10/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 22043 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1957 | 20/10/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/11/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 452 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
20/10/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1917. Dep: 01/12/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1419 (Diagram 18) |
||
29/10/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1921. Dep: 04/02/1922. | ||
09/04/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/04/1922. Dep: 09/04/1922. Work undertaken: Ross Pop |
||
31/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1923. Dep: 25/08/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 414 (Diagram 18) |
||
29/09/1923 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 452C | ||
20/09/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
23/09/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
21/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1925. Dep: 30/01/1926. Work undertaken: Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5452 |
||
21/12/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
21/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1928. Dep: 16/06/1928. | ||
30/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
11/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1930. Dep: 15/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 558 (Diagram 18) |
||
14/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1934. Dep: 11/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1825 (Diagram 18) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
29/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) | ||
06/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
04/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1937. Dep: 16/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 718 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
16/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
30/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/10/1937. Dep: 30/10/1937. Work undertaken: Trip cock gear fitted |
||
01/11/1937 | Allocation | |||
02/10/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
18/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 846 (Diagram 18) |
||
16/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1941. Dep: 24/01/1942. | ||
18/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1943. Dep: 11/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18) |
||
27/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. | ||
10/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945. | ||
23/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1946. Dep: 30/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 149 (Diagram 18) |
||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9812 | ||
27/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1947. Dep: 25/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22353 (Diagram 18) |
||
14/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
15/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
23/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
29/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
30/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1949. Dep: 11/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3849 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69812 |
||
07/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 07/06/1950. Dep: 08/07/1950. | ||
23/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1951. Dep: 29/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22383 (Diagram 18) |
||
01/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/01/1952. Dep: 04/01/1952. | ||
04/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/10/1952. Dep: 25/10/1952. | ||
10/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1954. Dep: 18/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22382 (Diagram 18) |
||
24/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
13/02/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
11/03/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
29/07/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
04/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1957. Dep: 12/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22043 (Diagram 18) |
||
19/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/10/1957. Dep: 20/10/1957. | ||
07/07/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69812 from Colwick (40E) | ||
09/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |