|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 21/03/1925 | 30/05/1925 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5045 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1927 | 27/08/1927 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/04/1929 | 15/06/1929 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 86 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1931 | 25/07/1931 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1933 | 05/08/1933 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1826 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/04/1935 | 04/05/1935 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 704 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1936 | 08/08/1936 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1938 | 12/03/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1940 | 06/04/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 278 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1942 | 15/08/1942 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 947 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1943 | 13/11/1943 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 3859 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/02/1944 | 26/02/1944 | 23 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1945 | 11/08/1945 | 43 days | General | New frames & cylinders Boiler number 171 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1947 | 10/05/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3848 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1948 | 13/11/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 210 (Diagram 18) WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69824 |
||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1949 | 16/07/1949 | 69 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1950 | 26/08/1950 | 11 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 3861 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1952 | 02/05/1952 | 35 days | General | Part 2 built-up chimney fitted Boiler number 22390 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/09/1954 | 13/11/1954 | 50 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1957 | 21/09/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 22399 (Diagram 18) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/04/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 45 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
21/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1925. Dep: 30/05/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5045 |
||
29/04/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
16/06/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
25/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1927. Dep: 27/08/1927. | ||
06/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1929. Dep: 15/06/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 86 (Diagram 18) |
||
13/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1931. Dep: 25/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 18) |
||
08/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1933. Dep: 05/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1826 (Diagram 18) |
||
06/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1935. Dep: 04/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 704 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
11/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936. | ||
12/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1938. Dep: 12/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18) |
||
02/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1940. Dep: 06/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 278 (Diagram 18) |
||
20/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1942. Dep: 15/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 947 (Diagram 18) |
||
18/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1943. Dep: 13/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3859 (Diagram 18) |
||
04/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/02/1944. Dep: 26/02/1944. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
30/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1945. Dep: 11/08/1945. Work undertaken: New frames & cylinders Boiler number 171 (Diagram 18) |
||
21/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9824 | ||
29/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1947. Dep: 10/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3848 (Diagram 18) |
||
23/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1948. Dep: 13/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 210 (Diagram 18) WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69824 |
||
30/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
05/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
13/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
19/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
09/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1949. Dep: 16/07/1949. | ||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
16/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/08/1950. Dep: 26/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3861 (Diagram 18) |
||
15/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
16/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
27/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
02/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
29/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1952. Dep: 02/05/1952. Work undertaken: Part 2 built-up chimney fitted Boiler number 22390 (Diagram 18) |
||
11/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
25/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/09/1954. Dep: 13/11/1954. | ||
30/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
17/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
20/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1957. Dep: 21/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22399 (Diagram 18) |
||
13/04/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
16/12/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69824 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
01/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |