|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1917 | 07/1917 | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number D611 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1923 | 20/02/1924 | 103 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1927 | 18/01/1928 | 119 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1931 | 10/10/1931 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1934 | 29/09/1934 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2195 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1938 | 12/01/1939 | 38 days | General | Boiler number D2055 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1941 | 13/03/1941 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2204 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1943 | 01/05/1943 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2382 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/02/1945 | 10/03/1945 | 25 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1947 | 16/08/1947 | 48 days | General | Boiler number D2054 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1949 | 19/02/1949 | 19 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 69772 |
||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1949 | 02/03/1949 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1949 | 18/11/1949 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2378 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1951 | 18/10/1951 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1952 | 21/04/1952 | 51 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/02/1954 | 06/03/1954 | 32 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1954 | 10/03/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/03/1954 | 25/03/1954 | 10 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/02/1946 | Detail Alterations | B2 1671 has returned to Cambridge painted green, for Royal workings. 8783, one of the former Cambridge 'Royal' Clauds, has also been repainted green, and has been transferred to King's Lynn for working the Royal Train between there and Wolferton. Previously a black Lynn Claud, usually 8792, has been used on the Lynn-Wolferton part of the run. it is rumoured that a scheme is being prepared for altering the layout at King's Lynn by the completion of a triangle, which would enable Royal and other trains for the Hunstanton line to run through Lynn without reversing. 1671 is to be named 'Royal Sovereign,' a more appropriate name for its present duties than 'Manchester City.' N.B. locos recently fitted with graduated steam brake and vacuum in place of Westinghouse include 9380 an 9772. J38 1421/44 have had the steam reverse replaced by screw. |
SLS/194604 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1910 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1126 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 55Sat boiler fitted |
||
1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1917. Dep: ?/07/1917. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number D611 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
10/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1923. Dep: 20/02/1924. | ||
22/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1927. Dep: 18/01/1928. | ||
31/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1931. Dep: 10/10/1931. | ||
16/10/1931 | Modification | Diagram 55Sup number 2381 boiler fitted | ||
22/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1934. Dep: 29/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2195 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
06/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1938. Dep: 12/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2055 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
01/06/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1941. Dep: 13/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2204 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
25/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1943. Dep: 01/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2382 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
14/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945. | ||
24/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9772 | ||
28/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
30/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1947. Dep: 16/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2054 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
01/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/02/1949. Dep: 19/02/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69772 |
||
23/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1949. Dep: 02/03/1949. | ||
25/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1949. Dep: 18/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2378 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
13/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/09/1951. Dep: 18/10/1951. | ||
02/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/03/1952. Dep: 21/04/1952. | ||
03/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1954. Dep: 06/03/1954. | ||
08/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/03/1954. Dep: 10/03/1954. | ||
16/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/03/1954. Dep: 25/03/1954. | ||
27/11/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
16/12/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69772 from Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
01/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |