|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1919 | 10/1919 | General | Boiler number G942 (Diagram 55Sup) |
|||
Darlington Works | 1921 | 12/1921 | General | Boiler number G946 (Diagram 55Sat) |
|||
Darlington Works | 28/03/1923 | 11/06/1923 | 76 days | General | Boiler number G933 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1928 | 21/06/1928 | 59 days | General | Boiler number G943 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1932 | 24/05/1932 | 37 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 2382 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1935 | 26/09/1935 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2492 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1939 | 16/09/1939 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2195 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1941 | 28/05/1941 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1942 | 30/06/1942 | 42 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1942 | 31/07/1942 | 26 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1944 | 04/05/1944 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2378 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1946 | 09/11/1946 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2050 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1950 | 19/05/1950 | 36 days | General | Rebuilt To Part 1 Boiler number 24747 (Diagram 63B) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 Renumbered to BR 69774 |
||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1953 | 02/07/1953 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1954 | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1910 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1136 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Selby (SEL) Diagram 55Sat boiler fitted |
||
1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/10/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number G942 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/12/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number G946 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
28/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1923. Dep: 11/06/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number G933 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
16/05/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
14/06/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (MAL) | ||
24/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1928. Dep: 21/06/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number G943 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
18/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1932. Dep: 24/05/1932. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 2382 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
03/10/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
12/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1935. Dep: 26/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2492 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
10/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1939. Dep: 16/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2195 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
16/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
09/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/05/1941. Dep: 28/05/1941. | ||
20/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/05/1942. Dep: 30/06/1942. | ||
06/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/07/1942. Dep: 31/07/1942. | ||
05/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1944. Dep: 04/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2378 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
12/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9774 | ||
01/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2050 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
14/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1950. Dep: 19/05/1950. Work undertaken: Rebuilt To Part 1 Boiler number 24747 (Diagram 63B) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 Renumbered to BR 69774 |
||
21/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/05/1953. Dep: 02/07/1953. | ||
04/1954 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
18/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 18/08/1954. | ||
23/08/1954 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69774 from Hull Springhead (53C) |