|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 04/08/1923 | 09/08/1923 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1923 | 19/10/1923 | 3 days | Unclassified | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1479N |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1923 | 13/12/1923 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/03/1924 | 07/04/1924 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1924 | 09/06/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1924 | 11/10/1924 | 11 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1925 | 11/04/1925 | 97 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4479 |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1926 | 05/06/1926 | 110 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1927 | 18/06/1927 | 90 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1927 | 14/11/1927 | 25 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1928 | 31/03/1928 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1928 | 04/03/1929 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 7697 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1929 | 20/02/1930 | 77 days | General | Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1930 | 16/12/1930 | 58 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1931 | 03/12/1931 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 7647 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/02/1932 | 23/03/1932 | 41 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1933 | 08/04/1933 | 61 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1933 | 16/11/1933 | 48 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1934 | 19/09/1934 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 7697 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1935 | 16/04/1935 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/09/1935 | 25/10/1935 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1936 | 18/11/1936 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 7795 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/12/1937 | 03/02/1938 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1938 | 11/04/1938 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1938 | 21/07/1938 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1939 | 20/05/1939 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/09/1940 | 19/10/1940 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 7776 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/07/1942 | 08/08/1942 | 31 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9211 (Diagram 94A) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1944 | 23/03/1944 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1944 | 04/04/1944 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1945 | 06/10/1945 | 60 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/12/1946 | 08/02/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9566 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1949 | 02/03/1949 | 48 days | General | To 75% Cut-off Renumbered to BR 60110 |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1950 | 03/08/1950 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 9215 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1951 | 28/08/1951 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 27056 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1952 | 02/01/1953 | 44 days | General | Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1953 | 17/02/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1953 | 10/07/1953 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/05/1954 | 13/07/1954 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 27070 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1955 | 27/01/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1955 | 10/01/1956 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1957 | 08/06/1957 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27025 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1957 | 14/06/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1959 | 30/05/1959 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 27020 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1960 | 03/09/1960 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1961 | 08/03/1961 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27052 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1961 | 13/09/1961 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1962 | 28/04/1962 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1963 | 31/01/1963 | 31 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. | SLS/194903 |
31/03/1950 | Inverurie Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 62275, 4479/80, 64489, 65222/41/50/94, ex-L.M.S. Nos. 4181, 4257, 15198, 15234, 55263. 16251, 16325, 17357, 17405/33. | SLS/195005 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/07/1923 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1479, name: ROBERT THE DEVIL Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1571 Allocated to Grantham (GRA) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
04/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/08/1923. Dep: 09/08/1923. | ||
17/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/10/1923. Dep: 19/10/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1479N |
||
11/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/12/1923. Dep: 13/12/1923. | ||
26/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1924. Dep: 07/04/1924. | ||
02/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/06/1924. Dep: 09/06/1924. | ||
01/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 01/10/1924. Dep: 11/10/1924. | ||
05/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1925. Dep: 11/04/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4479 |
||
16/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1926. Dep: 05/06/1926. | ||
21/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1927. Dep: 18/06/1927. | ||
21/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/10/1927. Dep: 14/11/1927. | ||
07/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1928. Dep: 31/03/1928. | ||
17/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1928. Dep: 04/03/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7697 (Diagram 94) |
||
06/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1929. Dep: 20/02/1930. Work undertaken: Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
20/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/10/1930. Dep: 16/12/1930. | ||
20/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1931. Dep: 03/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7647 (Diagram 94) |
||
12/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/02/1932. Dep: 23/03/1932. | ||
07/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1933. Dep: 08/04/1933. | ||
30/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/09/1933. Dep: 16/11/1933. | ||
16/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1934. Dep: 19/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7697 (Diagram 94) |
||
08/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/04/1935. Dep: 16/04/1935. | ||
05/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1935. Dep: 25/10/1935. | ||
08/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1936. Dep: 18/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7795 (Diagram 94) |
||
28/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1937. Dep: 03/02/1938. | ||
05/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1938. Dep: 11/04/1938. | ||
18/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/07/1938. Dep: 21/07/1938. | ||
14/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939. | ||
05/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7776 (Diagram 94) |
||
07/01/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
09/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/07/1942. Dep: 08/08/1942. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9211 (Diagram 94A) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
08/08/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
11/10/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
23/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1944. Dep: 23/03/1944. | ||
30/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1944. Dep: 04/04/1944. | ||
08/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 509 but not taken up | ||
24/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 110 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
28/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1946. Dep: 08/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9566 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
08/02/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
14/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1949. Dep: 02/03/1949. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off Renumbered to BR 60110 |
||
19/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1950. Dep: 03/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9215 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
03/08/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
13/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1951. Dep: 28/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27056 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
20/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1952. Dep: 02/01/1953. Work undertaken: Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
13/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/02/1953. Dep: 17/02/1953. | ||
01/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/07/1953. Dep: 10/07/1953. | ||
25/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1954. Dep: 13/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27070 (Diagram 94A) |
||
24/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1955. Dep: 27/01/1955. | ||
28/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1955. Dep: 10/01/1956. | ||
25/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1957. Dep: 08/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27025 (Diagram 94A) |
||
06/1957 | Report | Report: With the introduction of the summer timetable there are, Mondays to Thursdays, no fewer than five daily non—stop trains between Kings Cross and Newcastle—an all-time record. These are the 7.45, 10.0 a.m., 4.0, 7.45 and 10.15 p.m. from Kings Cross, and the corresponding return trains from Newcastle leaving at 12.19, 1.4, 9.45 a.m., 12.24 and 6.15 p.m. The number is reduced from five to four down on Fridays, when` the "Car-Sleeper" does not run, although there are still five up. As a result of these alterations there are now eight through engine workings between Kings Cross and Newcastle. Kings Cross engines and men work down on the 7.45 a.m. "Morning Talisman," 10.0 a.m. "Flying Scotsman," 3.15 p.m. Niddrie goods, 4.50 p.m. "Tees-Tyne Pullman" and the 7.45 p.m. "Car-Sleeper," which has had the engine-changing stops at Grantham and York withdrawn. The engines and crews return from Newcastle on the following day in this order : 12.19 a.m. "Car-Sleeper," 8.0 a.m., 12.24 p.m., 9.20 a.m. "Tees-Tyne Pullman" and 9.45 a.m. "Morning Talisman." As the 3.15 p.m. down goods arrives at Newcastle after the 4.0 and 4.50 p.m. the crew start their rest period later and so return out of sequence. The Gateshead workings to London are unchanged (1.4 a.m. and 6.15 p.m. up and 10.10 a.m. and 10.15 p.m. down). As a result of these developments, "A1s" Nos. 60125/58 and "A3s" Nos. 60066 and 60110 have been sent to Kings Cross and have been used on Newcastle duties in company with other "A1s," "A3s" and "A4s" ; the "A3s" do not appear to have any difficulty keeping the timings of the faster trains. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) | ||
13/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/06/1957. Dep: 14/06/1957. | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
04/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1959. Dep: 30/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27020 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
15/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/08/1960. Dep: 03/09/1960. | ||
31/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1961. Dep: 08/03/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27052 (Diagram 94A) |
||
07/1961 | Modification | Modification: Trough deflectors fitted | ||
11/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/08/1961. Dep: 13/09/1961. | ||
10/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/04/1962. Dep: 28/04/1962. | ||
01/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/01/1963. Dep: 31/01/1963. | ||
23/05/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60110 from Kings Cross (34A) |