|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/12/1924 | 20/12/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/07/1925 | 23/07/1925 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1926 | 28/08/1926 | 71 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1927 | 08/11/1927 | 69 days | General | Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1928 | 25/01/1929 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 7696 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1930 | 01/03/1930 | 52 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1931 | 21/03/1931 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 7774 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1932 | 19/03/1932 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1933 | 03/05/1933 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 7778 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/04/1934 | 25/05/1934 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 7703 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/03/1935 | 16/05/1935 | 52 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/03/1936 | 20/05/1936 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 7696 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1937 | 08/05/1937 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1938 | 05/05/1938 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 7765 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1939 | 27/05/1939 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1940 | 01/06/1940 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1942 | 14/03/1942 | 44 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1943 | 18/01/1944 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1945 | 17/11/1945 | 62 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8081 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1947 | 17/05/1947 | 44 days | General | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1947 | 08/10/1947 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1948 | 27/09/1948 | 52 days | General | To 75% Cut-off Renumbered to BR 60051 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1950 | 23/11/1950 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27013 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/10/1952 | 04/12/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27028 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5580 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1954 | 11/03/1954 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1954 | 29/07/1954 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27080 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1956 | 01/03/1956 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1957 | 31/01/1957 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1958 | 28/02/1958 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27056 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1959 | 08/08/1959 | 12 days | Unclassified | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1959 | 03/11/1959 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1960 | 30/03/1960 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 27033 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1962 | 29/03/1962 | 53 days | Light Casual | Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/07/1962 | 26/09/1962 | 58 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1962 | 21/12/1962 | 22 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/05/1947 | Doncaster Works | Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). | SLS/194708 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
31/07/1962 | A3 trough-pattern smoke deflectors | The number of Class A3 Pacifics fitted with trough-pattern smoke deflectors is forty-three. A further six locos have since been modified at Doncaster Works and includes an additional example, not previously recorded, bringing the total equipped at the time of writing to exactly fifty. 60036 Colombo 7/62, 60066 Merry Hampton 10/61, 60037 Hyperion 5/62, 60075 St. Frusquin 4/62, 60051 Blink Bonny 3/62, 60111 Enterprise 4/62. 60054 Prince of Wales 5/62. | SLS/196210 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/10/1924 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5260 | ||
12/11/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2550, name: BLINK BONNY Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1606 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
13/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/12/1924. Dep: 20/12/1924. | ||
09/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
16/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/07/1925. Dep: 23/07/1925. | ||
19/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1926. Dep: 28/08/1926. | ||
01/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1927. Dep: 08/11/1927. Work undertaken: Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
17/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1928. Dep: 25/01/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7696 (Diagram 94) |
||
09/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1930. Dep: 01/03/1930. | ||
09/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1931. Dep: 21/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7774 (Diagram 94) |
||
29/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1932. Dep: 19/03/1932. | ||
10/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1933. Dep: 03/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7778 (Diagram 94) |
||
09/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1934. Dep: 25/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7703 (Diagram 94) |
||
26/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1935. Dep: 16/05/1935. | ||
31/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1936. Dep: 20/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7696 (Diagram 94) |
||
05/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1937. Dep: 08/05/1937. | ||
21/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1938. Dep: 05/05/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7765 (Diagram 94) |
||
20/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939. | ||
23/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1940. Dep: 01/06/1940. | ||
05/01/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
30/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1942. Dep: 14/03/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
14/03/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
02/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
09/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1943. Dep: 18/01/1944. | ||
11/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
14/07/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
15/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. | ||
29/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
11/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
17/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/09/1945. Dep: 17/11/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8081 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 519 but not taken up | ||
24/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 51 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
04/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1947. Dep: 17/05/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
17/05/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
25/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/09/1947. Dep: 08/10/1947. | ||
07/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1948. Dep: 27/09/1948. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off Renumbered to BR 60051 |
||
03/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
05/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
15/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1950. Dep: 23/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27013 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
23/11/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
29/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1952. Dep: 04/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27028 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5580 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
04/12/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
15/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
24/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/02/1954. Dep: 11/03/1954. | ||
02/05/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
15/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1954. Dep: 29/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27080 (Diagram 94A) |
||
18/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1956. Dep: 01/03/1956. | ||
19/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1957. Dep: 31/01/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
05/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
29/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1958. Dep: 28/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27056 (Diagram 94A) |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
07/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
28/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/07/1959. Dep: 08/08/1959. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
16/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1959. Dep: 03/11/1959. | ||
13/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1960. Dep: 30/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27033 (Diagram 94A) |
||
19/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
18/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
05/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1962. Dep: 29/03/1962. Work undertaken: Trough deflectors fitted |
||
31/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1962. Dep: 26/09/1962. | ||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
30/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/11/1962. Dep: 21/12/1962. | ||
02/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
15/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
23/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60051 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
01/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |