|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 09/11/1925 | 12/02/1926 | 96 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1926 | 24/02/1926 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1926 | 07/01/1927 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1927 | 09/12/1927 | 93 days | General | Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 23/12/1927 | 06/01/1928 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1929 | 21/03/1929 | 79 days | General | Joco regulator valve & Flaman speed recorder fitted Boiler number 7801 (Diagram 94) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1929 | 22/08/1929 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1930 | 14/03/1930 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 7799 (Diagram 94) |
||
Gateshead Works | 23/02/1931 | 13/03/1931 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1931 | 03/06/1931 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 7802 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1931 | 15/01/1932 | 37 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1932 | 19/11/1932 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1933 | 02/12/1933 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 7783 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1935 | 02/02/1935 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1936 | 15/02/1936 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1936 | 09/12/1936 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/01/1938 | 12/02/1938 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 7878 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1938 | 06/08/1938 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1938 | 31/08/1938 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/05/1939 | 10/06/1939 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1940 | 27/07/1940 | 24 days | General | Tender number 5211 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/05/1942 | 31/05/1942 | 30 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27035 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5258 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1944 | 18/03/1944 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1944 | 14/10/1944 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/07/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 59 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1945 | 29/09/1945 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1946 | 18/01/1947 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 8252 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1949 | 29/04/1949 | 54 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1950 | 19/01/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27024 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1952 | 17/07/1952 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27020 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1952 | 14/10/1952 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1953 | 07/12/1953 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1954 | 18/05/1954 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27025 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1955 | 30/04/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27049 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1956 | 09/08/1956 | 50 days | General | To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1958 | 01/04/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 10544 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1959 | 03/04/1959 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1959 | 04/09/1959 | 12 days | Unclassified | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1960 | 25/03/1960 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27040 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/06/1960 | 26/07/1960 | 30 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1945 | Leeds Area | Latest B.16/3 843 appeared on 2.5.p.m. Darlington-Leeds turn on 20/9. B.17 2826 was noted on 3/10 working north on a Class A Goods on the main line near Thirsk. N.13 2405 and J.21 1593 proceeded north through Ripon on 5/10 coupled together (1593 'dead') apparently going to works. The chief effect of the new timetables seems to have been a reduction in the loading of long distance passenger trains. The 9.20 a.m. Newcastle-Liverpool E.P. during the first eleven days of the new timetable consisted of 14-16 bogies, compared with 15-18 previously. It has now been cut to 12 daily and the train is still double-headed from Ripon to Leeds. During the summer the relief to this train usually was made up of 12-14 bogies, and was always worked by one engine! Ex-N.E. Z have been much in evidence on Neville Hill turns lately. Since 4/10 the following combinations have been noted on the 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool: 2204 & 4866; 2193, 2206 an 722 all piloting 2568 on different days; 2208 & 3648; and 729 & 211 on the 9.0 Liverpool-Newcastle: On 12/10 the relief 9.20 Newcastle-Liverpool was worked by K.2 4651 with 10 bogies, and piloted from Ripon by A.6 688 bunker first. D.21 1245 which was awaiting works at the Darlington shed visit in July, has reappeared, and was first noted on 8/10, piloting D.20 1210 on the 9.40 a.m. Leeds to Middlesbrough (a regular double-headed working). | SLS/194601 |
30/04/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in Works during April included Nos. 13, 17, 60033/34, 56, 69, 91, 60527, 802/07/96, 911/28/34/54, while those ex the Paint Shop included Nos. 60004/10/27/28/55 an 60100. As yet there is not any sign of either the new blue or green paint being used. | SLS/194906 |
10/03/1963 | Ardsley MPD (Stored) | Stored at Ardsley on 10th March-60036/69/70/7/80/92/125, 61068/310, 64719/49/54/6/60/96/859/79/86/911/8/69, 67742/63/5/6/77. | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Washingborough Junction (Stored) | The Washingborough Junc.- Pelham St. Junc, section of the Boston-Lincoln line has been taken out of use; trains now use the former avoiding line from Washingborough Junc. (s.b. now closed) to Greetwell Junc. and the GN/GE Joint line thence to Lincoln Central. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/09/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2568, name: SCEPTRE Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23106 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
09/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1925. Dep: 12/02/1926. | ||
15/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/02/1926. Dep: 24/02/1926. | ||
15/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/12/1926. Dep: 07/01/1927. | ||
08/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1927. Dep: 09/12/1927. Work undertaken: Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
23/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/12/1927. Dep: 06/01/1928. | ||
02/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1929. Dep: 21/03/1929. Work undertaken: Joco regulator valve & Flaman speed recorder fitted Boiler number 7801 (Diagram 94) |
||
16/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/08/1929. Dep: 22/08/1929. | ||
22/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1930. Dep: 14/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7799 (Diagram 94) |
||
23/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1931. Dep: 13/03/1931. | ||
25/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 03/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7802 (Diagram 94) |
||
10/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/12/1931. Dep: 15/01/1932. | ||
05/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1932. Dep: 19/11/1932. | ||
02/1933 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Pump removed | ||
25/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1933. Dep: 02/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7783 (Diagram 94) |
||
02/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1935. Dep: 02/02/1935. | ||
08/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1936. Dep: 15/02/1936. | ||
30/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1936. Dep: 09/12/1936. | ||
11/12/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
13/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1938. Dep: 12/02/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7878 (Diagram 94) |
||
02/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/08/1938. Dep: 06/08/1938. | ||
19/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1938. Dep: 31/08/1938. | ||
02/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1939. Dep: 10/06/1939. | ||
09/05/1940 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5279 | ||
04/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1940. Dep: 27/07/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 5211 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
02/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/05/1942. Dep: 31/05/1942. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27035 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5258 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
31/05/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
17/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944. | ||
20/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944. | ||
19/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. | ||
23/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945. | ||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 537 | ||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69 | ||
04/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8252 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
18/01/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
08/07/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60069 | ||
07/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1949. Dep: 29/04/1949. | ||
13/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1950. Dep: 19/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27024 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
05/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1952. Dep: 17/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27020 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
17/07/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
06/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/10/1952. Dep: 14/10/1952. | ||
17/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/11/1953. Dep: 07/12/1953. | ||
14/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1954. Dep: 18/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27025 (Diagram 94A) |
||
06/1954 | Modification | Modification: Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive | ||
25/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27049 (Diagram 94A) |
||
21/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1956. Dep: 09/08/1956. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off |
||
27/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1958. Dep: 01/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10544 (Diagram 94A) |
||
14/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
19/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/03/1959. Dep: 03/04/1959. | ||
24/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/08/1959. Dep: 04/09/1959. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
15/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1960. Dep: 25/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27040 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
27/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/06/1960. Dep: 26/07/1960. | ||
20/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) | ||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60069 from Ardsley (56B) |