|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 06/01/1925 | 27/03/1925 | 81 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1925 | 10/10/1925 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1926 | 10/08/1926 | 142 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1926 | 25/08/1926 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1926 | 14/10/1926 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1927 | 17/06/1927 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1927 | 22/03/1928 | 85 days | General | Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1928 | 08/06/1928 | 3 days | Unclassified | Tender number 5279 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1928 | 27/02/1929 | 87 days | General | Boiler number 7803 (Diagram 94) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1929 | 24/01/1930 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 7796 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/07/1930 | 30/08/1930 | 60 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/01/1931 | 29/01/1931 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1931 | 14/12/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7803 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1933 | 15/02/1933 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1933 | 09/11/1933 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1934 | 10/11/1934 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1935 | 20/04/1935 | 65 days | Light Repair | Big end broken and motion damaged |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1936 | 31/03/1936 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 7801 (Diagram 94) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1936 | 26/06/1936 | 5 days | Unclassified | Right trailing box heating |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1937 | 11/03/1937 | 41 days | General | Tender number 5285 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1937 | 05/01/1938 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/05/1938 | 06/05/1938 | 1 day | Light Repair | Bogie changed |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/01/1939 | 18/02/1939 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1940 | 21/03/1940 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1941 | 03/05/1941 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 7775 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1941 | 23/05/1941 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1943 | 06/03/1943 | 22 days | General | Tender number 5569 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1943 | 16/03/1943 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1944 | 30/12/1944 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1946 | 13/07/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | Rebuilt to class A3 |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/07/1948 | 27/08/1948 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 9572 (Diagram 94HP) Renumbered to BR 60070 |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1948 | 13/10/1948 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1952 | 15/02/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27002 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1952 | 26/03/1952 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/05/1953 | 03/07/1953 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27009 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1955 | 18/05/1955 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27064 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1957 | 23/03/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27020 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1957 | 08/01/1958 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1958 | 14/11/1958 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1959 | 25/04/1959 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27059 (Diagram 94HP) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1960 | 30/03/1960 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1961 | 13/09/1961 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 27069 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
10/03/1963 | Ardsley MPD (Stored) | Stored at Ardsley on 10th March-60036/69/70/7/80/92/125, 61068/310, 64719/49/54/6/60/96/859/79/86/911/8/69, 67742/63/5/6/77. | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Washingborough Junction (Stored) | The Washingborough Junc.- Pelham St. Junc, section of the Boston-Lincoln line has been taken out of use; trains now use the former avoiding line from Washingborough Junc. (s.b. now closed) to Greetwell Junc. and the GN/GE Joint line thence to Lincoln Central. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/09/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2569, name: GLADIATEUR Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23107 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
06/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/01/1925. Dep: 27/03/1925. | ||
28/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/09/1925. Dep: 10/10/1925. | ||
22/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1926. Dep: 10/08/1926. | ||
11/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/08/1926. Dep: 25/08/1926. | ||
23/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/09/1926. Dep: 14/10/1926. | ||
08/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/06/1927. Dep: 17/06/1927. | ||
29/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1927. Dep: 22/03/1928. Work undertaken: Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
24/04/1928 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5328 | ||
16/05/1928 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5273 | ||
06/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/06/1928. Dep: 08/06/1928. Work undertaken: Tender number 5279 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
03/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1928. Dep: 27/02/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7803 (Diagram 94) |
||
21/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1929. Dep: 24/01/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7796 (Diagram 94) |
||
02/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1930. Dep: 30/08/1930. | ||
14/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1931. Dep: 29/01/1931. | ||
09/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1931. Dep: 14/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7803 (Diagram 94) |
||
01/1933 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Pump removed | ||
04/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1933. Dep: 15/02/1933. | ||
27/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1933. Dep: 09/11/1933. | ||
05/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1934. Dep: 10/11/1934. | ||
15/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/02/1935. Dep: 20/04/1935. Work undertaken: Big end broken and motion damaged |
||
10/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1936. Dep: 31/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7801 (Diagram 94) |
||
22/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1936. Dep: 26/06/1936. Work undertaken: Right trailing box heating |
||
30/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 11/03/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 5285 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
02/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1937. Dep: 05/01/1938. | ||
18/04/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
06/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/05/1938. Dep: 06/05/1938. Work undertaken: Bogie changed |
||
13/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1939. Dep: 18/02/1939. | ||
17/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1940. Dep: 21/03/1940. | ||
10/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1941. Dep: 03/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7775 (Diagram 94) |
||
19/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/05/1941. Dep: 23/05/1941. | ||
13/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1943. Dep: 06/03/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 5569 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
06/03/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
11/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1943. Dep: 16/03/1943. | ||
14/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1944. Dep: 30/12/1944. | ||
06/01/1945 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor number 5477 | ||
17/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 538 | ||
06/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
02/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 70 | ||
06/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/07/1946. Dep: 13/07/1946. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 |
||
18/01/1947 | Modification | Diagram 94A number 9565 boiler fitted | ||
19/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1948. Dep: 27/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9572 (Diagram 94HP) Renumbered to BR 60070 |
||
01/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/10/1948. Dep: 13/10/1948. | ||
12/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
18/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
16/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1952. Dep: 15/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27002 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
27/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
15/02/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
06/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/03/1952. Dep: 26/03/1952. | ||
21/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1953. Dep: 03/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27009 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
30/08/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
28/02/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
04/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1955. Dep: 18/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27064 (Diagram 94A) |
||
21/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1957. Dep: 23/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27020 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
05/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
03/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
19/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1957. Dep: 08/01/1958. | ||
03/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/11/1958. Dep: 14/11/1958. | ||
06/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1959. Dep: 25/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27059 (Diagram 94HP) Double Chimney fitted |
||
07/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
06/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
14/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1960. Dep: 30/03/1960. | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
20/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) | ||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
27/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1961. Dep: 13/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27069 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
08/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
04/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60070 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
07/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |