|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 28/08/1925 | 05/11/1925 | 70 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 30/03/1926 | 31/03/1926 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1926 | 17/09/1926 | 138 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1926 | 30/09/1926 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1927 | 21/03/1927 | 57 days | Light Repair | New Right Hand cylinder |
||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1927 | 23/06/1927 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/06/1927 | 02/07/1927 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1928 | 17/04/1928 | 78 days | Heavy | Tender change Boiler number 8030 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5325 (LNER Corridor) attached. Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1929 | 15/03/1929 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1929 | 31/10/1929 | 81 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/05/1930 | 15/05/1930 | 11 days | Special | Valves |
||
Gateshead Works | 08/07/1930 | 17/07/1930 | 10 days | Special | Valves |
||
Gateshead Works | 08/10/1930 | 22/10/1930 | 15 days | Special | Valves |
||
Gateshead Works | 21/11/1930 | 08/12/1930 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1931 | 02/03/1931 | 15 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/02/1932 | 16/03/1932 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 8252 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1933 | 17/02/1933 | 28 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1933 | 12/05/1933 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1934 | 14/04/1934 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1935 | 06/03/1935 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 8249 (Diagram 94HP) Westinghouse Pump removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1936 | 27/02/1936 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1936 | 11/07/1936 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 06/11/1936 | 06/11/1936 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1936 | 29/01/1937 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1937 | 10/01/1938 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/08/1938 | 26/09/1938 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1939 | 24/05/1939 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1940 | 29/06/1940 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 8251 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/06/1942 | 14/07/1942 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 8082 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5268 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1944 | 25/03/1944 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1945 | 17/11/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1947 | 02/08/1947 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 8721 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1947 | 23/08/1947 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1948 | 22/05/1948 | 13 days | Light Repair | Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining Renumbered to BR 60074 |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1948 | 10/12/1948 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 9120 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1950 | 17/11/1950 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27010 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1952 | 06/11/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27040 (Diagram 94HP) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/08/1954 | 15/09/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27061 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/08/1955 | 31/08/1955 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1955 | 06/01/1956 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27055 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1957 | 10/01/1957 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1957 | 11/07/1957 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1957 | 18/10/1957 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27077 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1958 | 27/11/1958 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1959 | 20/03/1959 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27041 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1960 | 12/04/1960 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1960 | 17/01/1961 | 41 days | General | Tender number 5271 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/10/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2573, name: HARVESTER Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23111 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
28/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/08/1925. Dep: 05/11/1925. | ||
30/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/03/1926. Dep: 31/03/1926. | ||
03/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1926. Dep: 17/09/1926. | ||
22/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/09/1926. Dep: 30/09/1926. | ||
24/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/01/1927. Dep: 21/03/1927. Work undertaken: New Right Hand cylinder |
||
10/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/06/1927. Dep: 23/06/1927. | ||
28/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/06/1927. Dep: 02/07/1927. | ||
31/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/01/1928. Dep: 17/04/1928. Work undertaken: Tender change Boiler number 8030 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5325 (LNER Corridor) attached. Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
18/04/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
02/07/1928 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5274 | ||
05/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
10/07/1928 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5283 | ||
18/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/02/1929. Dep: 15/03/1929. | ||
12/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1929. Dep: 31/10/1929. | ||
05/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Special) - Arr: 05/05/1930. Dep: 15/05/1930. Work undertaken: Valves |
||
08/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Special) - Arr: 08/07/1930. Dep: 17/07/1930. Work undertaken: Valves |
||
08/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Special) - Arr: 08/10/1930. Dep: 22/10/1930. Work undertaken: Valves |
||
21/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/11/1930. Dep: 08/12/1930. | ||
16/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1931. Dep: 02/03/1931. | ||
04/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1932. Dep: 16/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8252 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
21/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/01/1933. Dep: 17/02/1933. | ||
23/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1933. Dep: 12/05/1933. | ||
21/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1934. Dep: 14/04/1934. | ||
28/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1935. Dep: 06/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8249 (Diagram 94HP) Westinghouse Pump removed |
||
14/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1936. Dep: 27/02/1936. | ||
11/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936. | ||
06/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 06/11/1936. Dep: 06/11/1936. | ||
14/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1936. Dep: 29/01/1937. | ||
12/04/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
06/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1937. Dep: 10/01/1938. | ||
21/02/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
27/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/08/1938. Dep: 26/09/1938. | ||
19/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1939. Dep: 24/05/1939. | ||
02/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
28/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
04/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1940. Dep: 29/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8251 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
10/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1942. Dep: 14/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8082 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5268 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
14/07/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
22/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1944. Dep: 25/03/1944. | ||
06/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1945. Dep: 17/11/1945. | ||
03/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 542 | ||
30/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 74 | ||
13/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1947. Dep: 02/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8721 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
13/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/08/1947. Dep: 23/08/1947. | ||
10/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/05/1948. Dep: 22/05/1948. Work undertaken: Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining Renumbered to BR 60074 |
||
03/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1948. Dep: 10/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9120 (Diagram 94A) |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
12/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1950. Dep: 17/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27010 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
27/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
17/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
06/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1952. Dep: 06/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27040 (Diagram 94HP) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
04/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1954. Dep: 15/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27061 (Diagram 94A) |
||
17/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/08/1955. Dep: 31/08/1955. | ||
22/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1955. Dep: 06/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27055 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
01/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/01/1957. Dep: 10/01/1957. | ||
06/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/07/1957. Dep: 11/07/1957. | ||
29/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1957. Dep: 18/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27077 (Diagram 94A) |
||
18/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/11/1958. Dep: 27/11/1958. | ||
05/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1959. Dep: 20/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27041 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
05/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/04/1960. Dep: 12/04/1960. | ||
08/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1960. Dep: 17/01/1961. Work undertaken: Tender number 5271 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
08/04/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60074 from Neville Hill (55H) |