|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1949 | 10/06/1949 | 45 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/09/1950 | 04/10/1950 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/09/1951 | 31/10/1951 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1953 | 15/04/1953 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29858 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1953 | 23/04/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1954 | 21/12/1954 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29865 (Diagram 118) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/09/1955 | 03/09/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/10/1955 | 12/10/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/11/1955 | 10/11/1955 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/12/1956 | 01/02/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29850 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1958 | 10/10/1958 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29855 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1960 | 13/04/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29788 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1961 | 06/05/1961 | 48 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1962 | 27/07/1962 | 88 days | General | Boiler number 29874 (Diagram 118) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1965 | 20/05/1965 | 102 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/02/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 528, name: TUDOR MINSTREL Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2019 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
25/06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60528 | ||
27/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1949. Dep: 10/06/1949. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
26/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
02/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
11/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/09/1950. Dep: 04/10/1950. | ||
26/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/09/1951. Dep: 31/10/1951. | ||
11/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1953. Dep: 15/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29858 (Diagram 118) |
||
20/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1953. Dep: 23/04/1953. | ||
17/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1954. Dep: 21/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29865 (Diagram 118) |
||
02/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/09/1955. Dep: 03/09/1955. | ||
10/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/10/1955. Dep: 12/10/1955. | ||
01/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1955. Dep: 10/11/1955. | ||
28/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1956. Dep: 01/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29850 (Diagram 118) |
||
25/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1958. Dep: 10/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29855 (Diagram 118) |
||
07/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1960. Dep: 13/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29788 (Diagram 117) |
||
02/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Perth South (63A) | ||
28/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
20/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1961. Dep: 06/05/1961. | ||
19/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
01/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1962. Dep: 27/07/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29874 (Diagram 118) |
||
08/02/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/02/1965. Dep: 20/05/1965. | ||
24/04/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
02/06/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60528 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
08/1966 | Scrapped | Scrapped |