|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1948 | 14/07/1948 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/07/1950 | 30/08/1950 | 36 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1951 | 25/10/1951 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1952 | 31/07/1952 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/12/1953 | 15/01/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 10636 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1955 | 25/03/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29801 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1956 | 14/11/1956 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 29837 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1958 | 01/05/1958 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29790 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1958 | 18/10/1958 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1959 | 21/10/1959 | 36 days | General | AWS fitted Boiler number 29789 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1961 | 13/10/1961 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29833 (Diagram 118) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
02/02/1963 | Glasgow - Aberdeen Pacific workings | The last regular workings of L.N.E.R Pacifics - during December and January, Ferryhill usually used 60009 an 60011 on the 7-10 a.m. to Glasgow (back with the 5-30 p.m.) but 60002/4/57/97/522/37 also appeared, whilst the standbies were 60527 or 60955 (rarely required). 60537 appeared on 25th January-one month after its 'withdrawal'! ' St. Rollox usually used 60027* on the 8-25 a.m. to Aberdeen (back with the 5-15 p.m.) with as standby 60031 or 60090, whilst 60012 was borrowed from Haymarket for most of November and December; other locomotives to appear were 60004/512/955/72 an 73153. * 60027 was in Grangemouth shed for repair on 11th February. | SLS/196303 |
02/02/1963 | Glasgow - Aberdeen Pacific workings | The last regular workings of L.N.E.R Pacifics - during December and January, Ferryhill usually used 60009 an 60011 on the 7-10 a.m. to Glasgow (back with the 5-30 p.m.) but 60002/4/57/97/522/37 also appeared, whilst the standbies were 60527 or 60955 (rarely required). 60537 appeared on 25th January-one month after its 'withdrawal'! ' St. Rollox usually used 60027* on the 8-25 a.m. to Aberdeen (back with the 5-15 p.m.) with as standby 60031 or 60090, whilst 60012 was borrowed from Haymarket for most of November and December; other locomotives to appear were 60004/512/955/72 an 73153. * 60027 was in Grangemouth shed for repair on 11th February. | SLS/196303 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/06/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60537, name: BACHELOR'S BUTTON Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2028 Allocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
06/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/07/1948. Dep: 14/07/1948. | ||
02/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
08/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
01/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
02/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
26/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1950. Dep: 30/08/1950. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
30/08/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
07/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
20/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/09/1951. Dep: 25/10/1951. | ||
19/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/06/1952. Dep: 31/07/1952. | ||
16/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1953. Dep: 15/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10636 (Diagram 118) |
||
24/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1955. Dep: 25/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29801 (Diagram 118) |
||
28/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1956. Dep: 14/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29837 (Diagram 118) |
||
24/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1958. Dep: 01/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29790 (Diagram 117) |
||
03/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/10/1958. Dep: 18/10/1958. | ||
16/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1959. Dep: 21/10/1959. Work undertaken: AWS fitted Boiler number 29789 (Diagram 117) |
||
28/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1961. Dep: 13/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29833 (Diagram 118) |
||
13/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60537 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |