|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1949 | 22/04/1949 | 22 days | Light Casual | Modified for trials |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1949 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1949 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1950 | 14/04/1950 | 68 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1950 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1951 | 31/01/1951 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1952 | 06/06/1952 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1952 | 02/01/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29803 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1954 | 07/04/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 10596 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/05/1955 | 09/06/1955 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1955 | 07/11/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 10592 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1957 | 22/08/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29830 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1959 | 01/05/1959 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29879 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1959 | 01/07/1959 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1960 | 05/01/1961 | 36 days | General | Modified for trials Boiler number 29810 (Diagram 118) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1950 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 60020/43/54, 60133/41, 60512/39, 60820/65/67, 61083, 61634, 61822/24/61, 61947/85, 67713/24, 69444, 69505. A considerable number of 'Pacific' and 'V.2' Class locomotives are being fitted with A.T.C. gear, as part of the ex-G.N. main line has already been equipped with A.T.C. apparatus; this may be extended. | SLS/195005 |
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
31/01/1954 | York MPD | J77 class 0-6-OT's, normally rare at York, were represented there in January by 68435 (53C) under repair at the north shed towards the end of the month, and 68401 (53B) shunting at Queen Street and later under repair at the south shed. On 1/1/54 65022 (Class J2) was noted 'dead' en route for breaking up at Darlington Works hauled by an 'Austerity' 2-8-0. By contrast new Diesel 13079 from Darlington came up light through York on 19/1/54. Other unusual visitors included 60519 (64B) ex-works on Doncaster turns into York on 16/1/54. One of the Westinghouse fitted Standard Class 5 4-6-0's from Derby, 73031, visited York on 6/1/54. The engine concerned in the derailment of the down 'Heart of Midlothian' at Thirsk on 20/1/54 was 60126 (52B) which was later noted 'dead' in York shed yard. On the evening of the derailment the down 'Aberdonian' and other expresses were diverted from York via Knaresborough, Bilton, and Ripon. 60080 (52B) failed at York on the 7.45 a.m. Newcastle-King's Cross express (non-stop from Darlington to Peterborough) on 25/1/54 and was replaced by the York south end pilot 60502 (50A) which went forward 34 minutes late. 60539 (52B) took over this working on the next day. |
SLS/195403 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
10/03/1963 | Goole MPD (Stored in Works Yards) | Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. | SLS/196304 |
23/04/1963 | Doncaster Works (Stored in Works Yards) | New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/08/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60539, name: BRONZINO Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2030 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
01/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/04/1949. Dep: 22/04/1949. Work undertaken: Modified for trials |
||
23/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 23/05/1949. | ||
13/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 13/06/1949. | ||
06/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1950. Dep: 14/04/1950. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
14/04/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
05/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/09/1950. | ||
08/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/01/1951. Dep: 31/01/1951. | ||
14/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/05/1952. Dep: 06/06/1952. | ||
03/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1952. Dep: 02/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29803 (Diagram 118) |
||
09/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1954. Dep: 07/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10596 (Diagram 118) |
||
17/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/05/1955. Dep: 09/06/1955. | ||
03/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 07/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10592 (Diagram 118) |
||
18/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1957. Dep: 22/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29830 (Diagram 118) |
||
24/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1959. Dep: 01/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29879 (Diagram 118) |
||
12/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/06/1959. Dep: 01/07/1959. | ||
01/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1960. Dep: 05/01/1961. Work undertaken: Modified for trials Boiler number 29810 (Diagram 118) |
||
01/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60539 from Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
19/04/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |