|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 21/09/1945 | 20/10/1945 | 30 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1946 | 06/04/1946 | 13 days | Unclassified | For self cleaning smokebox |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/04/1947 | 08/05/1947 | 16 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/12/1948 | 29/01/1949 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 28625 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61007 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/03/1951 | 05/04/1951 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/02/1953 | 14/03/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28702 (Diagram 100A) |
||
R & W Hawthorn | 05/10/1954 | 22/10/1954 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
R & W Hawthorn | 07/06/1955 | 18/06/1955 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/07/1955 | 27/08/1955 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
R & W Hawthorn | 17/05/1957 | 30/05/1957 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/08/1957 | 13/09/1957 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/10/1957 | 23/11/1957 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28543 (Diagram 100A) |
||
R & W Hawthorn | 19/10/1958 | 22/10/1958 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
St. Rollox Works | 30/03/1959 | 25/04/1959 | 27 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/06/1959 | 10/07/1959 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/01/1962 | 03/02/1962 | 27 days | Light Casual | Boiler number 28614 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/02/1962 | 16/02/1962 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/12/1963 | 28/12/1963 | 16 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1962 | De-named B1 | Both nameplates were removed from Thompson Class B1 4-6-0 loco. 61007 (formerly Klipspringer) when out-shopped ex-Cowlairs Works in March. | SLS/196207 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/04/1944 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 8308, name: KLIPSPRINGER Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1928 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
15/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
21/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945. | ||
27/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1007 | ||
25/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/03/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946. Work undertaken: For self cleaning smokebox |
||
23/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/04/1947. Dep: 08/05/1947. | ||
28/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
03/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
25/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
31/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
08/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1948. Dep: 29/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28625 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61007 |
||
13/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/03/1951. Dep: 05/04/1951. | ||
11/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1953. Dep: 14/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28702 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1954. Dep: 22/10/1954. | ||
07/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/06/1955. Dep: 18/06/1955. | ||
27/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/07/1955. Dep: 27/08/1955. | ||
17/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/05/1957. Dep: 30/05/1957. | ||
28/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/08/1957. Dep: 13/09/1957. | ||
15/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1957. Dep: 23/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28543 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/10/1958. Dep: 22/10/1958. | ||
30/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1959. Dep: 25/04/1959. | ||
18/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/06/1959. Dep: 10/07/1959. | ||
30/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
01/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
08/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/01/1962. Dep: 03/02/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28614 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1962. Dep: 16/02/1962. | ||
29/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
21/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ayr (67C) | ||
13/12/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/12/1963. Dep: 28/12/1963. | ||
06/02/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61007 from Ayr (67C) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |