|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 23/10/1948 | 20/11/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 5090 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61016 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1950 | 10/10/1950 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28107 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 04/09/1951 | 28/09/1951 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 01/10/1951 | 04/10/1951 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1952 | 27/09/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28453 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1954 | 24/07/1954 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28107 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1955 | 27/10/1955 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/12/1955 | 22/12/1955 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1956 | 25/04/1956 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1956 | 01/11/1956 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28458 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1958 | 02/10/1958 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28244 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1958 | 24/10/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1958 | 01/12/1958 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1959 | 06/07/1959 | 12 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1960 | 18/11/1960 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28439 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1964 | 21/05/1964 | 32 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1954 | York Area | October Two further representatives of Class B17 visited York in October, after visits to Doncaster Works, namely 61670 (32D) on 6/10/54 and 61659 (32A) on 28/10/54. Further unusual visitors on 6/10/54 were 45038 (5B) and Stanier 2-6-0 42956 (5B). On 11/10/54 69770 (53A) passed through York for Darlington Works. On 16/10/54 61223 (31A) 'worked an Up freight train, and 68429 (J77) passed through light after a period in store at Selby en route for several weeks' loan to Sunderland. On 19/10/54 73053 (20A) failed at York when working the 8.46 a.m. from Bradford (Forster Square) to Scarborough and was replaced by 61016 (50A). A few days later 73066 (20A) commenced appearances on this turn; this engine has tender 1005/54 of B.R. Series 1C. 69771 (53A) passed through York on 2/11/54 en route for scrapping at Darlington; the rate of withdrawal of this class is being accelerated and 69780 (53C) has also been withdrawn from service in November. 67772 (34E), ex-Darlington Works, passed through York on 2/11/54 returning to Neasden, and on 17/11/54 67740 (34E) appeared in similar circumstances. 63856 (54B) was in York shed yard with motion disconnected, etc., on 30/11/54, en route for Gorton Works; this is one of the locomotives fitted with the additional pumps on the right hand side of the boiler in connection with the Tyne Dock-Consett iron ore trains. 73053 (20A) became divided between the engine and tender at about 10 a.m. on 19/11/54 while running at speed with the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City to Scarborough, necessitating the train being drawn back to Church Fenton where it was re-engined and went forward at 11.5 a.m. 73053 was later removed to York shed for repair where it remained for some days. |
SLS/195412 |
25/04/1964 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/01/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1016, name: INYALA Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1996 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
23/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1948. Dep: 20/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5090 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61016 |
||
13/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1950. Dep: 10/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28107 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/09/1951. Dep: 28/09/1951. | ||
01/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1951. Dep: 04/10/1951. | ||
01/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1952. Dep: 27/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28453 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1954. Dep: 24/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28107 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/10/1955. Dep: 27/10/1955. | ||
14/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/12/1955. Dep: 22/12/1955. | ||
27/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/03/1956. Dep: 25/04/1956. | ||
03/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1956. Dep: 01/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28458 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
02/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1958. Dep: 02/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28244 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
16/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1958. Dep: 24/10/1958. | ||
01/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 01/12/1958. Dep: 01/12/1958. | ||
25/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/06/1959. Dep: 06/07/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
15/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1960. Dep: 18/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28439 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
13/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
12/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
20/04/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/04/1964. Dep: 21/05/1964. | ||
31/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61016 from Low Moor (56F) | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |