|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 10/11/1948 | 31/12/1948 | 52 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61021 |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/05/1949 | 26/05/1949 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1951 | 04/04/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28202 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1952 | 18/10/1952 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1953 | 25/04/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28125 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1953 | 07/05/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1955 | 13/05/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28154 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1957 | 29/06/1957 | 27 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1957 | 02/07/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1959 | 30/10/1959 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28603 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1962 | 01/11/1962 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28874 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/03/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1021, name: REITBOK Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2001 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
10/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1948. Dep: 31/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61021 |
||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
16/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/05/1949. Dep: 26/05/1949. | ||
05/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1951. Dep: 04/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28202 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
02/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/10/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952. | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
27/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28125 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 07/05/1953. Dep: 07/05/1953. | ||
18/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1955. Dep: 13/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28154 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
03/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1957. Dep: 29/06/1957. | ||
01/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/07/1957. Dep: 02/07/1957. | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
20/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
21/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1959. Dep: 30/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28603 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
01/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1962. Dep: 01/11/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28874 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/06/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61021 from York (North) (50A) | ||
08/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |