|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 29/09/1949 | 28/10/1949 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 5077 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1951 | 06/10/1951 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28222 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1951 | 10/10/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1953 | 14/10/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1953 | 21/11/1953 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28815 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1956 | 28/02/1956 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28463 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/03/1958 | 17/04/1958 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1958 | 23/06/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28440 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1958 | 13/08/1958 | 45 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1959 | 24/03/1959 | 14 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1959 | 27/05/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1961 | 25/11/1961 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28700 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/04/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1024, name: ADDAX Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2004 Allocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
17/12/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61024 | ||
29/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1949. Dep: 28/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5077 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
14/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1951. Dep: 06/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28222 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/10/1951. Dep: 10/10/1951. | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
14/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 14/10/1953. Dep: 14/10/1953. | ||
30/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1953. Dep: 21/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28815 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1956. Dep: 28/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28463 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/03/1958. Dep: 17/04/1958. | ||
23/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1958. Dep: 23/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28440 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) | ||
30/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1958. Dep: 13/08/1958. | ||
11/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1959. Dep: 24/03/1959. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
25/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1959. Dep: 27/05/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
20/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
31/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1961. Dep: 25/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28700 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
31/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
15/05/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61024 from Wakefield (56A) | ||
07/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |