03/01/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 61342 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number 1000 Allocated to Eastfield (EFD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
|
|
23/08/1950 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/08/1950. Dep: 16/09/1950. |
|
|
25/12/1950 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/12/1950. Dep: 05/01/1951. |
|
|
10/05/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/05/1951. Dep: 22/05/1951. |
|
|
13/08/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/08/1951. Dep: 16/08/1951. |
|
|
07/11/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/11/1951. Dep: 14/11/1951. |
|
|
14/01/1952 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 14/01/1952. Dep: 02/02/1952. |
|
|
01/05/1952 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/05/1952. Dep: 15/05/1952. |
|
|
02/09/1952 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/09/1952. Dep: 12/09/1952. |
|
|
18/11/1952 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/11/1952. Dep: 06/12/1952. |
|
|
15/10/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/10/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953. |
|
|
23/02/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1954. Dep: 27/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28663 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
|
23/04/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/04/1954. Dep: 23/04/1954. |
|
|
18/11/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/11/1954. Dep: 19/11/1954. |
|
|
28/11/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/11/1955. Dep: 24/12/1955. |
|
|
24/02/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/02/1956. Dep: 10/03/1956. |
|
|
15/05/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1957. Dep: 24/05/1957. |
|
|
24/12/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/12/1957. Dep: 29/01/1958. |
|
|
26/02/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1959. Dep: 06/03/1959. |
|
|
23/03/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/03/1959. Dep: 23/04/1959. |
|
|
13/02/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1960. Dep: 02/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28669 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
|
30/06/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/06/1961. Dep: 13/07/1961. |
|
|
06/08/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/08/1962. Dep: 10/08/1962. |
|
|
10/12/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/12/1962. Dep: 05/01/1963. |
|
|
06/10/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/10/1964. Dep: 07/11/1964. |
|
|
10/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61342 from Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
27/02/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|