14/09/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 61354 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2076 Allocated to St Margarets (64A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
|
|
25/10/1949 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/10/1949. Dep: 01/11/1949. |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) |
|
|
11/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) |
|
|
14/08/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 14/08/1951. Dep: 06/09/1951. |
|
|
17/09/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/09/1951. Dep: 19/09/1951. |
|
|
29/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
13/01/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 13/01/1953. Dep: 06/02/1953. |
|
|
20/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) |
|
|
25/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
25/08/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1954. Dep: 09/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28635 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
|
24/12/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/12/1954. Dep: 08/01/1955. |
|
|
13/12/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/12/1956. Dep: 19/01/1957. |
|
|
27/03/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1959. Dep: 25/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28664 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
|
20/10/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 20/10/1961. Dep: 09/12/1961. |
|
|
06/06/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1963. Dep: 03/08/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28400 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
|
18/01/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/01/1964. Dep: 06/02/1964. |
|
|
05/03/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1965. Dep: 26/04/1965. |
|
|
24/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
13/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61354 from Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by P.W. McLellan: Langloan |
|
|