|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 15/06/1951 | 10/07/1951 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/06/1953 | 20/06/1953 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 28638 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Inverurie Works | 29/12/1953 | 05/02/1954 | 39 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/05/1954 | 10/06/1954 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/07/1954 | 07/08/1954 | 32 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/08/1954 | 04/09/1954 | 19 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28646 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/09/1954 | 17/09/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/05/1955 | 28/05/1955 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/01/1956 | 18/02/1956 | 27 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/01/1958 | 15/02/1958 | 41 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/12/1958 | 25/12/1958 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/04/1959 | 18/04/1959 | 13 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/07/1959 | 11/07/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/09/1959 | 24/10/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28659 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/09/1961 | 21/10/1961 | 47 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
27/11/1949 | Eastfield MPD | On 27/11 No. 61359-the last of the recent Darlington batch No, 2081/49-was on the shed. It was noted that a 64A (St. Margaret's) shed plate was carried. The tender was smooth-sided and carried the crest; the Tender No. was 4349/49. | SLS/195001 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/10/1949 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61359 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2081 Allocated to St Margarets (64A) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
15/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/06/1951. Dep: 10/07/1951. | ||
01/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1953. Dep: 20/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28638 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/12/1953. Dep: 05/02/1954. | ||
21/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/05/1954. Dep: 10/06/1954. | ||
07/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/07/1954. Dep: 07/08/1954. | ||
17/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/08/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28646 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1954. Dep: 17/09/1954. | ||
03/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/05/1955. Dep: 28/05/1955. | ||
23/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/01/1956. Dep: 18/02/1956. | ||
06/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/01/1958. Dep: 15/02/1958. | ||
03/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/12/1958. Dep: 25/12/1958. | ||
06/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/04/1959. Dep: 18/04/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
07/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/07/1959. Dep: 11/07/1959. | ||
18/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1959. Dep: 24/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28659 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/09/1961. Dep: 21/10/1961. | ||
28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61359 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |