|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 01/07/1922 | 29/07/1922 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1845 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1923 | 01/03/1924 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6168 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1925 | 31/10/1925 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1935 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/02/1927 | 16/04/1927 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1928 | 30/06/1928 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1929 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1929 | 21/09/1929 | 92 days | General | Rebuilt to class B3/2 Boiler number 80 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1929 | 14/12/1929 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1930 | 18/01/1930 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1930 | 17/05/1930 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1930 | 01/11/1930 | 8 days | Light Repair | Steam chest gauge fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1931 | 28/03/1931 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 355 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1931 | 08/08/1931 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 07/11/1931 | 21/11/1931 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1932 | 08/10/1932 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 356 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1933 | 21/10/1933 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1934 | 09/06/1934 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1934 | 15/12/1934 | 1 day | Light Repair | Lubricator position changed |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1935 | 01/06/1935 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 65 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1936 | 29/08/1936 | 36 days | General | New right & left cylinders Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1937 | 27/03/1937 | 15 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1938 | 06/08/1938 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1940 | 30/03/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3010 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1940 | 21/12/1940 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1942 | 10/10/1942 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1944 | 24/06/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3035 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1946 | 28/09/1946 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1920 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1168, name: LORD STUART OF WORTLEY Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
04/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
01/07/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1922. Dep: 29/07/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1845 (Diagram 13) |
||
08/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1923. Dep: 01/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6168 |
||
06/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
27/04/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
25/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1925. Dep: 31/10/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1935 (Diagram 13) |
||
19/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1927. Dep: 16/04/1927. | ||
16/04/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
14/05/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
28/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1928. Dep: 30/06/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1929 (Diagram 13) |
||
20/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
14/06/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1929. Dep: 21/09/1929. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B3/2 Boiler number 80 (Diagram 13) |
||
14/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/12/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929. | ||
18/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/01/1930. Dep: 18/01/1930. | ||
05/02/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
21/02/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
03/03/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
10/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/05/1930. Dep: 17/05/1930. | ||
25/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/10/1930. Dep: 01/11/1930. Work undertaken: Steam chest gauge fitted |
||
07/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1931. Dep: 28/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 355 (Diagram 13) |
||
01/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/08/1931. Dep: 08/08/1931. | ||
07/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/11/1931. Dep: 21/11/1931. | ||
03/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1932. Dep: 08/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 356 (Diagram 13) |
||
21/03/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
14/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/10/1933. Dep: 21/10/1933. | ||
28/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1934. Dep: 09/06/1934. | ||
15/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/12/1934. Dep: 15/12/1934. Work undertaken: Lubricator position changed |
||
04/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1935. Dep: 01/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 65 (Diagram 13) |
||
12/03/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
25/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1936. Dep: 29/08/1936. Work undertaken: New right & left cylinders Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 13) |
||
13/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/03/1937. Dep: 27/03/1937. | ||
18/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1938. Dep: 06/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 13) |
||
24/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3010 (Diagram 13) |
||
30/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 21/12/1940. | ||
04/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13) |
||
27/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3035 (Diagram 13) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1485 but not taken up | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1499 but not taken up | ||
28/09/1946 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 6168 from Neasden (NEA) | ||
28/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 28/09/1946. Dep: 28/09/1946. |