|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/01/1911 | 03/03/1911 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1914 | 04/07/1914 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/05/1915 | 07/08/1915 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 834 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1920 | 03/07/1920 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1434 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1922 | 21/10/1922 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1924 | 26/04/1924 | 57 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6096 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/08/1927 | 19/11/1927 | 85 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1929 | 25/01/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/07/1930 | 16/08/1930 | 22 days | General | New 19in S.V. cylinders fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 23/07/1932 | 13/08/1932 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1934 | 15/09/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/10/1936 | 31/10/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1938 | 21/05/1938 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class B4/4 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1940 | 30/11/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/09/1942 | 17/10/1942 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1945 | 21/07/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1946 | 02/11/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 04/07/1947 | 04/07/1947 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1096 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4817 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted |
||
13/01/1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1911. Dep: 03/03/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
04/05/1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1914. Dep: 04/07/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1214 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
29/05/1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1915. Dep: 07/08/1915. Work undertaken: Boiler number 834 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
08/05/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1920. Dep: 03/07/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1434 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
19/08/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1922. Dep: 21/10/1922. | ||
08/12/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
01/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1924. Dep: 26/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6096 |
||
29/05/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
20/01/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
27/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1927. Dep: 19/11/1927. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
14/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1929. Dep: 25/01/1930. | ||
26/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1930. Dep: 16/08/1930. Work undertaken: New 19in S.V. cylinders fitted |
||
23/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1932. Dep: 13/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
18/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1934. Dep: 15/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
17/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
23/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1938. Dep: 21/05/1938. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B4/4 |
||
08/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
16/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
09/08/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
16/08/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
25/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
16/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1945. Dep: 21/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1491 but not taken up | ||
07/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1481 | ||
26/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. | ||
04/07/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1481 from Lincoln (LIN) | ||
04/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 04/07/1947. Dep: 04/07/1947. |